Sims v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Sims
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00480
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 11/13/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
May 28, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re 17 Scheduling Order: If no dispositive motions are filed, jury selection will take place on 6/16/2020. (Shafer, J.)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER:The Court has evaluated the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report #15 and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 11/13/2019 at 3:00 PM. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by /1/2020. Dispositive motions are due by 04/1/2020. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 05/1/2020, and jury selection will take place on 06/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 10/1/2020, and jury selection will take place on 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month after jury selection is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #9 -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 02 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/24/2019. (Mattessich, William) Modified on 5/28/2019 (Shafer, J.).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time in light of the #14 Answer. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/20/2019. (Mattessich, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Michaud, Megan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Compass Group USA, Inc..(McKenna, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2019 to file an Answer or motion addressed to the Complaint by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jessica Sims. (Michaud, Megan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Leigh Michaud on behalf of Jessica Sims (Michaud, Megan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Compass Group USA, Inc., #8 Standing Protective Order, #9 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Compass Group USA, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Compass Group USA, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Compass Group USA, Inc., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Velez, F.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2019; Discovery due by 10/1/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/1/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 1, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Compass Group USA, Inc. of Pending Motions (McKenna, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Compass Group USA, Inc. of Statement Regarding Removed Case (McKenna, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. McKenna on behalf of Compass Group USA, Inc. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Compass Group USA, Inc. from Superior Court, case number HHD-CV19-6108852-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5216255, filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McKenna, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Sims
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?