Gibson et al v. Demkowicz Management of Farmington, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden, Jessica Burciaga, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Cielo Jean Gibson and Lina Posada
Defendant: Wendy Clarke, Demkowicz Management of Farmington, LLC d/b/a Hollywood Cabaret, Andrew Wielblad, Demkowicz Management of Farmington LLC and Demkowicz Management of Farmington LLC doing business as Hollywood Cabaret
Case Number: 3:2019cv00500
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Golaszewski on behalf of Jessica Burciaga, Cielo Jean Gibson, Lina Posada, Rhian Sugden, Tiffany Toth-Gray (Golaszewski, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269475) by Jessica Burciaga, Cielo Jean Gibson, Lina Posada, Rhian Sugden, Tiffany Toth-Gray. (Radshaw, John)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Attorney John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2019. (Reis, Julia)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269475) by Jessica Burciaga, Cielo Jean Gibson, Lina Posada, Rhian Sugden, Tiffany Toth-Gray. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Golaszewski)(Radshaw, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Toth-Gray, Lina Posada, Cielo Jean Gibson, Rhian Sugden, Jessica Burciaga. Andrew Wielblad served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Radshaw, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Toth-Gray, Lina Posada, Cielo Jean Gibson, Rhian Sugden, Jessica Burciaga. Wendy Clarke served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Radshaw, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Toth-Gray, Lina Posada, Cielo Jean Gibson, Rhian Sugden, Jessica Burciaga. Demkowicz Management of Farmington LLC served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Radshaw, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Wendy Clarke, Demkowicz Management of Farmington LLC, Andrew Wielblad* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Radshaw, III* *900 Chapel Street, Suite 620* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Reis, Julia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Lina Posada, Rhian Sugden, Jessica Burciaga, Cielo Jean Gibson, Tiffany Toth-Gray, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2019 Discovery due by 10/3/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 3, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Wendy Clarke, Demkowicz Management of Farmington, LLC d/b/a Hollywood Cabaret, Andrew Wielblad. (Radshaw, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wendy Clarke, Demkowicz Management of Farmington, LLC d/b/a Hollywood Cabaret, Andrew Wielblad ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5221961.), filed by Tiffany Toth-Gray, Lina Posada, Cielo Jean Gibson, Rhian Sugden, Jessica Burciaga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radshaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. Demkowicz Management of Farmington, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demkowicz Management of Farmington, LLC d/b/a Hollywood Cabaret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wielblad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demkowicz Management of Farmington LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demkowicz Management of Farmington LLC doing business as Hollywood Cabaret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth-Gray
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?