Geiger et al v. C&G of Groton, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Eason Middleton, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Cora Skinner, Tara Leigh Patrick, Carissa Rosario, Vida Guerra, Ina Schnitzer, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Hinton, Megan Daniels, Dessie Mitcheson, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Hillary Hepner, Jessa Hinton, Carmen Electra, Megan Vogt and Jordan Carver
Defendant: Service Road Corporation d/b/a Mynx Hartford, C&G of Groton, Inc. d/b/a Mynx Groton, Alfred Ciraldo, C&G of Groton, Inc., Service Road Corp., C&G of Groton, Inc. doing business as Mynx Groton and Service Road Corp. doing business as Mynx Hartford
Case Number: 3:2019cv00502
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Set Deadlines/Hearings:Post-Discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Baran, Hugh)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: See attached Initial Scheduling Order for full details.Following a telephonic scheduling conference held on July 8, 2019, the Court adopts the following pre-trial schedule in this case:-Initial disclosures due by August 16, 2019.-Joinder of parties due by August 2, 2019.-Amended pleadings due by July 19, 2019 (Plaintiffs) and August 2, 2019 (Defendants).-Damages analysis due by September 6, 2019.-On issues for which a party bears the burden of proof, expert disclosures due by April 3, 2020; expert depositions to be completed by May 1, 2020.-On issues for which a party does not bear the burden of proof, expert disclosures due by June 5, 2020; expert depositions to be completed by July 10, 2020-Fact depositions to be completed by July 10, 2020.-Discovery shall close by September 11, 2020. -The Court will convene a post-discovery telephonic status conference on September 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562.-Dispositive motions are due by October 2, 2020.-Joint trial memorandum is due by November 6, 2020, or 30 days after the Court rules on any dispositive motion.-The parties' trial ready date is December 7, 2020, or 30 days after the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/11/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 7/8/2019. Scheduling order to follow. Total time: 8 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Baran, Hugh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Baran, Hugh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Golaszewski, John)
June 14, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time until July 1, 2019 to file joint Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/14/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until July 1, 2019 to Submit 26(f) Report Set Deadlines/Hearings by C&G of Groton, Inc., Alfred Ciraldo, Service Road Corp.. (Lapp, Steven)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Golaszewski on behalf of Megan Daniels, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Vida Guerra, Jessica Hinton, Jamie Eason Middleton, Dessie Mitcheson, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Carissa Rosario, Ina Schnitzer, Cora Skinner, Hillary Fisher Vinson (Golaszewski, John)
May 8, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17/2019 (Perez, J.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269404) by Megan Daniels, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Vida Guerra, Jessica Hinton, Jamie Eason Middleton, Dessie Mitcheson, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Carissa Rosario, Ina Schnitzer, Cora Skinner, Hillary Fisher Vinson. (Radshaw, John)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John V. Golaszewski. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269404) by Megan Daniels, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Vida Guerra, Jessica Hinton, Jamie Eason Middleton, Dessie Mitcheson, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Carissa Rosario, Ina Schnitzer, Cora Skinner, Hillary Fisher Vinson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Golaszewski)(Radshaw, John)
May 4, 2019 Answer deadline updated to 7/2/2019 for All Defendants. (Baran, Hugh)
May 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to July 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/4/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 2, 2019 to plead #1 Complaint, by C&G of Groton, Inc., Alfred Ciraldo, Service Road Corp.. (Lapp, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Service Road Corp.. (Lapp, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&G of Groton, Inc.. (Lapp, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Zarella on behalf of C&G of Groton, Inc., Alfred Ciraldo, Service Road Corp. (Zarella, Peter)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lapp on behalf of C&G of Groton, Inc., Alfred Ciraldo, Service Road Corp. (Lapp, Steven)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dessie Mitcheson, Megan Daniels, Tara Leigh Patrick, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Ina Schnitzer, Carissa Rosario, Vida Guerra, Jamie Eason Middleton, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Jessica Hinton, Lucy Pinder, Cora Skinner. C&G of Groton, Inc. served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Radshaw, John)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dessie Mitcheson, Megan Daniels, Tara Leigh Patrick, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Ina Schnitzer, Carissa Rosario, Vida Guerra, Jamie Eason Middleton, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Jessica Hinton, Lucy Pinder, Cora Skinner. Service Road Corp. served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Radshaw, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dessie Mitcheson, Megan Daniels, Tara Leigh Patrick, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Ina Schnitzer, Carissa Rosario, Vida Guerra, Jamie Eason Middleton, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Jessica Hinton, Lucy Pinder, Cora Skinner. Alfred Ciraldo served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Radshaw, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *C&G of Groton, Inc., Alfred Ciraldo, Service Road Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Radshaw, III* *900 Chapel Street Suite 620* *New Haven, CT 06510* (Fazekas, J.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Brenda Lynn Geiger, Lucy Pinder, Jamie Eason Middleton, Carissa Rosario, Tara Leigh Patrick, Dessie Mitcheson, Cora Skinner, Jessa Hinton, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Ina Schnitzer, Jessica Hinton, Megan Daniels, Vida Guerra, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2019. Discovery due by 10/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 3, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Radshaw, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5221994.), filed by Dessie Mitcheson, Megan Daniels, Tara Leigh Patrick, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Ina Schnitzer, Carissa Rosario, Vida Guerra, Jamie Eason Middleton, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Jessica Hinton, Lucy Pinder, Cora Skinner. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 D, #5 E, #6 F, #7 G, #8 H, #9 I, #10 J, #11 K, #12 L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radshaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger et al v. C&G of Groton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Eason Middleton
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynn Geiger
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Skinner
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Rosario
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vida Guerra
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Schnitzer
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Daniels
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Fisher Vinson
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Hepner
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessa Hinton
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Vogt
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Carver
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Road Corporation d/b/a Mynx Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&G of Groton, Inc. d/b/a Mynx Groton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Ciraldo
Represented By: Steven Lapp
Represented By: Peter J Zarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&G of Groton, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lapp
Represented By: Peter J Zarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Road Corp.
Represented By: Steven Lapp
Represented By: Peter J Zarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&G of Groton, Inc. doing business as Mynx Groton
Represented By: Steven Lapp
Represented By: Peter J Zarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Road Corp. doing business as Mynx Hartford
Represented By: Steven Lapp
Represented By: Peter J Zarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?