Krupa et al v. Keepers Inc
Plaintiff: Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray and Rachel Koren
Defendant: Keepers Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00503
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/17/2019 (Johnson, D.)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 26(f) NOTICE: Local Rule 26(f) provides that the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). The parties requested, and the Court granted, an extension of time for the parties to complete their report until July 3, 2019. That date has passed, but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties file on or before July 17, 2019 (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a Form 26(f) report; or (2) a Form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties' failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint and/or monetary sanctions being imposed on counsel. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/11/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
June 21, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/3/2019 (Johnson, D.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The #18 motion for extension of time to file a Rule 26(f) report is GRANTED. The parties shall file their joint 26(f) report by July 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/21/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 3, 2019 to file Rule 26f Report by Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray. (Radshaw, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO 15 Order,, by Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray filed by Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray. (Radshaw, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Keepers Inc.(Klein, Jonathan)
May 30, 2019 Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2019 (Johnson, D.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Plaintiffs filed a #9 affidavit of service on the docket reflecting that Defendant Keepers, Inc. was served on April 8, 2019. The Defendants response to the complaint was therefore due on April 29, 2019. The Defendant has not yet filed a responsive pleading. By June 20, 2019, the Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 or show cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/30/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Golaszewski on behalf of Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray (Golaszewski, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269433) by Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray. (Radshaw, John)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John V. Golaszewski, Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5269433) by Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Golaszewski)(Radshaw, John)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Joseph Klein on behalf of Keepers Inc (Klein, Jonathan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Rachel Koren. Keepers Inc served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Radshaw, John)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for 1. Summons; 2. Civil Cover Sheet; 3. Complaint with Exhibits A, B, and C; 4. Order on Pretrial Deadlines; 5. Electronic Fling Order; 6. Standing Protective Order; and 7. Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Parties. served on Keepers Inc. on 4/8/2019, filed by Rachel Koren, Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray. (Radshaw, John)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Keepers Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Radshaw, III* *900 Chapel Street, Suite 620* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Joanna Krupa, Rachel Koren, Tiffany Toth-Gray, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 04/05/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2019. Discovery due by 10/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 04/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
April 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Keepers Inc. (Radshaw, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5222006.), filed by Joanna Krupa, Tiffany Toth-Gray, Rachel Koren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radshaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krupa et al v. Keepers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keepers Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Joseph Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Krupa
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth-Gray
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?