Clapp v. Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Clapp
Defendant: Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv00506
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Department of Veterans Affairs to 5/19/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Clapp. (Einhorn, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO. (Rothgeb, Nicole)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO.Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Rothgeb, Nicole)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Rothgeb on behalf of Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO (Rothgeb, Nicole)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Clapp. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Einhorn, Jonathan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Clapp. Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Einhorn, Jonathan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan J. Einhorn* *Law Office of Jonathan J. Einhorn* *129 Whitney Avenue* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fanelle, N.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Jennifer Clapp Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2019. Discovery due by 10/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs (Veterans Affairs Connecticut Health System), Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5223033.), filed by Jennifer Clapp.(Einhorn, Jonathan)
April 4, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Department of Veterans Affairs (Veterans Affairs Connecticut Health System), Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO. (Einhorn, Jonathan)
April 4, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clapp v. Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1674, American Federation Of Government Employees, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Clapp
Represented By: Jonathan J. Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?