Greenwich Business Institute, Inc. v. Latin Markets Brazil, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Greenwich Business Institute, Inc.
Defendant: Adam Raleigh, Latin Markets Brazil, LLC and Paul Hamann
Case Number: 3:2019cv00529
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Perez, J.)
July 9, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Greenwich Business Institute, Inc. (McGuire, Bruce)
June 27, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Paul Hamann to 6/27/2019; Latin Markets Brazil, LLC to 6/27/2019; Adam Raleigh to 6/27/2019. (Perez, J.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/26/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2019 (Perez, J.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/27/19Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint responding to the Complaint #1 Complaint by Paul Hamann, Latin Markets Brazil, LLC, Adam Raleigh. (Lewis, Samuel)
June 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Paul Hamann to 6/24/2019; Latin Markets Brazil, LLC to 6/24/2019; Adam Raleigh to 6/24/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/11/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/24/19Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint responding to the Complaint #1 Complaint by Paul Hamann, Latin Markets Brazil, LLC, Adam Raleigh. (Lewis, Samuel)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Samuel A. Lewis. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Arthur R. Weaver. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel A. Lewis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5275334) by Paul Hamann, Latin Markets Brazil, LLC, Adam Raleigh. (Savino, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Arthur R. Weaver to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5275136) by Paul Hamann, Latin Markets Brazil, LLC, Adam Raleigh. (Savino, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Paul Hamann waiver sent on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019 filed by Paul Hamann. (Savino, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Adam Raleigh waiver sent on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019 filed by Adam Raleigh. (Savino, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Latin Markets Brazil, LLC waiver sent on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019 filed by Latin Markets Brazil, LLC. (Savino, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Adam Raleigh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bruce M. McGuire* *Bruce M. McGuire, Esq.* *16 Rocaton Road* *Darien, CT 06820*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Latin Markets Brazil, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bruce M. McGuire* *Bruce M. McGuire, Esq.* *16 Rocaton Road* *Darien, CT 06820*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Paul Hamann* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bruce M. McGuire* *Bruce M. McGuire, Esq.* *16 Rocaton Road* *Darien, CT 06820*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Greenwich Business Institute, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2019. Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
April 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Adam Raleigh. (McGuire, Bruce)
April 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to paul hamann. (McGuire, Bruce)
April 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Latin Markets Brazil, LLC d/b/a Markets Group. (McGuire, Bruce)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5230974.), filed by Greenwich Business Institute, Inc..(McGuire, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwich Business Institute, Inc. v. Latin Markets Brazil, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenwich Business Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce M. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Raleigh
Represented By: Samuel Lewis
Represented By: Michael Anthony Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latin Markets Brazil, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Lewis
Represented By: Michael Anthony Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hamann
Represented By: Samuel Lewis
Represented By: Michael Anthony Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?