Campeau v. Berryhill et al

Plaintiff: Arlene Campeau
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00564
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to reverse and/or remand due by 8/14/2019; Defendant's motion to affirm or for voluntary remand due by 10/14/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/14/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Social Security Transcripts by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Peterson, Oona)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Oona Marie Peterson on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Peterson, Oona)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/22/2019. (Shafer, J.)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case has been reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant, who was the presiding judge on related case 3:15CV1093(VLB). Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/22/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 15, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Nancy A. Berryhill to 6/14/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Oliver, T.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5238493.), filed by Arlene Campeau.(Buckley, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campeau v. Berryhill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Campeau
Represented By: Melissa A. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Oona Marie Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?