Neumann v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Bernd Neumann
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00567
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Government having filed its administrative record (Doc. No. 9), the court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order:Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before August 19, 2019. Defendant shall file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before October 18, 2019. Plaintiff may file a reply brief pursuant to Local Rule 7(d) on or before November 1, 2019. Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, counsel are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Scheduling Order which sets forth page limits, form and content requirements for motions, supporting memoranda, and statement of material facts (Doc. No. 3.) The parties should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion.Requests for extensions of these deadlines are discouraged and, unless unusual circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should not seek an extension of greater than 30 days. Any motion for extension of a deadline must include a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three days before the existing deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/20/19. (Caldero, M.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Social Security Transcripts by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rothstein, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 5/29/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Rothstein on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rothstein, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 6/15/2019. (Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to Self-represented Parties. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2019.(Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/16/2019.(Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/16/2019.(Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2019 Filing fee received from Bernd Neumann: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXH00015487. (Bozek, M.)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Bernd Neumann.(Bozek, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neumann v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernd Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Elizabeth Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?