SKM Restaurants, Inc. v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: SKM Restaurants, Inc.
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00588
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Answer deadline updated for James River Insurance Company to 7/25/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 25, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/28/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 25, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by James River Insurance Company. (Adams, Kathleen)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The defendant will file any dispositive motion concerning duty to defend no later than August 15, 2019. Following a ruling on such motion, if it is denied, the parties will submit within 7 days a proposed scheduling order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/14/2019. (Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019)(DeRubeis, B.)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER terminating #23 Motion to Dismiss. Terminating as moot in light of Doc. No. #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and 26 Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/11/2019. (Lewis, D)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Count 2 of the Amended Complaint filed by SKM Restaurants, Inc. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/11/2019.(Lewis, D) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Lewis, D).
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James River Insurance Company. (Adams, Kathleen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SKM Restaurants, Inc. (Allen, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by James River Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Adams, Kathleen)
June 5, 2019 Docket Entry Correction: Change document #15 to a MOTION to Remand and Updated Response deadline to 6/7/2019. (Pesta, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order: First Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 15) was filed by plaintiff on 5/17/2019. The Clerk is directed to terminate this Motion and redocket it as a Motion to Remand. Opposition to this Motion is due by 6/7/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/5/19.(Pesta, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SKM Restaurants, Inc. is denied as moot. Plaintiff seeks to dismiss Count 2 of its Complaint dated 4/5/2019 and an Amended Complaint was filed on May 28, 2019 (Doc. No. 17). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/5/2019.(DeRubeis, B.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER terminating as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss in light of #17 Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/5/2019. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adams, Kathleen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SKM Restaurants, Inc. (Allen, Gregory)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SKM Restaurants, Inc., filed by SKM Restaurants, Inc..(Allen, Gregory)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by James River Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Adams, Kathleen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by SKM Restaurants, Inc. Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Allen, Gregory) Modified event relief on 6/5/2019 per order 22 (Pesta, J.).
April 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/3/2019 (Lewis, D)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is directed to docket the Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/23/2019. (Lewis, D)
April 23, 2019 Answer deadline updated for James River Insurance Company to 5/20/2019. (Lewis, D)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2019 to respond to plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/23/2019. (Lewis, D)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #11 Order, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by James River Insurance Company, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2019 to respond to plaintiff's Complaint filed by James River Insurance Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by James River Insurance Company, #10 Protective Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by James River Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James River Insurance Company, #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by SKM Restaurants, Inc., #4 Notice of Appearance filed by James River Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/18/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2019 Discovery due by 10/19/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Hushin, Z.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by SKM Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Hushin, Z.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2019 to respond to plaintiff's Complaint by James River Insurance Company. (Adams, Kathleen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. O'Donnell on behalf of James River Insurance Company (O'Donnell, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen F. Adams on behalf of James River Insurance Company (Adams, Kathleen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by James River Insurance Company of Pending Motions (Adams, Kathleen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James River Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent James River Group, Inc. for James River Insurance Company. (Adams, Kathleen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James River Insurance Company from Superior Court, Judicial District of New Haven, case number NNH-CV19-6090763-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5245058, filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Removal Statement)(Adams, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKM Restaurants, Inc. v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKM Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A. O'Donnell
Represented By: Kathleen F. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?