Duncan v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Duncan
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., General Electric Company, CBS Corp and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00613
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The Plaintiff's #1 motion to dismiss with prejudice his claims against the remaining Defendants is GRANTED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). The complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/7/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss All Remaining Defendants by James Duncan.Responses due by 5/27/2019 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Plaintiff's #7 motion to dismiss with prejudice his claims against Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC is GRANTED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/29/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler LLC filed by James Duncan, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company, #10 Standing Protective Order, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company Signed by Clerk on 04/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler LLC by James Duncan.Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/24/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/24/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2019. Discovery due by 10/24/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/28/2019. Signed by Clerk on 04/24/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 24, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice Pursuant to Standing Order (Mohan, Catherine)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice of Pending Motions (Mohan, Catherine)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company from Superior Court Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-cv-19-6084649-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5250232, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (summons & complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Court Record, #3 Exhibit C (Notice to State Court))(Mohan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Duncan
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?