USA v. Contents of Account Ending 5423 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Contents of Account Ending 0524 Held in the Name of Stephen Consulting Group, LLC Defined Benefit at UBS Financial Services, Inc., Contents of Account Ending 5423 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank, Contents of Account Ending 5421 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank and Contents of Account Ending 6113 Held in the Name of Stephen Consulting Group, LLC at Wells Fargo Bank
Claimant: Kimberly A. Devoe, Gary S. Devoe and Stephen Consulting Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00614
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Decree of Forfeiture)(Turbert, Julie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN ON SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 06/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Turbert, Julie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 WARRANT Returned Executed as to (1) Contents of account ending 5423 held in names of Gary and Kimberly DeVoe. (Freberg, B)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT Returned Executed as to (2) Contents of account ending 5421 held in names of Gary and Kimberly DeVoe. (Freberg, B)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT Returned Executed as to (3) Contents of account ending 6113 held in the name of Stephen Consulting Group, LLC. (Freberg, B)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem for Contents of Account Ending in 6113 issued (Reis, Julia)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem for Contents of Account Ending in 5423 issued (Reis, Julia)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem for Contents of Account Ending in 5421 issued (Reis, Julia)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem for Contents of Account Ending in 0524 issued (Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Standing Protective Order, #2 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint,, filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint of Forfeiture against Contents of Account Ending 0524 Held in the Name of Stephen Consulting Group, LLC Defined Benefit at UBS Financial Services, Inc., Contents of Account Ending 5421 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank, Contents of Account Ending 5423 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank, Contents of Account Ending 6113 Held in the Name of Stephen Consulting Group, LLC at Wells Fargo Bank, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Turbert, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Contents of Account Ending 5423 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kimberly A. Devoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gary S. Devoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen Consulting Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Account Ending 0524 Held in the Name of Stephen Consulting Group, LLC Defined Benefit at UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Account Ending 5423 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Account Ending 5421 Held in the Names of Gary DeVoe and Kimberly DeVoe at Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contents of Account Ending 6113 Held in the Name of Stephen Consulting Group, LLC at Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?