Tague v. Architectural Designs, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Lee Tague
Defendant: Architectural Designs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00618
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Architectural Designs, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Architectural Designs, Inc..(Neigher, Alan)
May 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, on consent, to 6/21/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/10/19. (Tooker, A.)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2019 To answer the complaint #1 Complaint, by Architectural Designs, Inc.. (Neigher, Alan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Neigher on behalf of Architectural Designs, Inc. and Sheryle Levine (Neigher, Alan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Neigher on behalf of Architectural Designs, Inc. (Neigher, Alan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Neigher on behalf of Architectural Designs, Inc. (Neigher, Alan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John Davis, Vice President on May 2, 2019, filed by Steven Lee Tague. (Lauwers, Steven)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Architectural Designs, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven J. Lauwers* *Rath, Young, and Pignatelli, PC* *One Capital Plaza* *Concord, NH 03301-1500*. (Reis, Julia)
April 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Architectural Designs, Inc.. (Lauwers, Steven)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Steven Lee Tague #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2019 Discovery due by 10/25/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Architectural Designs, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5251786.), filed by Steven Lee Tague. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lauwers, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tague v. Architectural Designs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lee Tague
Represented By: Steven J. Lauwers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Architectural Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Neigher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?