Burckhardt v. Olschafaskie et al
Plaintiff: Carl Burckhardt
Defendant: Connecticut Medical Dispatch LLC, Michael J. Olschafaskie, Alex Collazo, East Hartford Cab Company, Inc., Ace Taxi Service, Inc. and Ace Transportation LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00619
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 7/8/2019 to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Counterclaims asserted in the Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim dated June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/1/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 8, 2019 to Answer, Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims #9 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Carl Burckhardt. (Gora, Richard)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion for Prefiling Conference. No request for a prefiling conference may be submitted unless the attorney making the request has conferred with other counsel of record and discussed the proposed motion in a good faith effort to clarify the issues, eliminate or reduce the area of controversy and arrive at a mutually satisfactory resolution. Cf. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 37(2)(requiring counsel to confer before filing motions relating to discovery disputes). Except in cases involving pro se parties, any request for a prefiling conference must include a statement that the attorney submitting the request has conferred with other counsel and must briefly describe the results of the conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/28/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pre-Motion Conference Seeking Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Conference by Carl Burckhardt. (Gora, Richard)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace Taxi Service, Inc., Ace Transportation LLC, Connecticut Medical Dispatch LLC, East Hartford Cab Company, Inc.. (Greene, Gary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Carl Burckhardt by Ace Taxi Service, Inc., Ace Transportation LLC, Alex Collazo, Connecticut Medical Dispatch LLC, Michael J. Olschafaskie, East Hartford Cab Company, Inc..(Greene, Gary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Joseph Greene on behalf of Ace Taxi Service, Inc., Ace Transportation LLC, Alex Collazo, Connecticut Medical Dispatch LLC, East Hartford Cab Company, Inc., Michael J. Olschafaskie (Greene, Gary)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ace Taxi Service, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Ace Transportation LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Alex Collazo waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Connecticut Medical Dispatch LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Michael J. Olschafaskie waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; East Hartford Cab Company, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 filed by Carl Burckhardt. (Gora, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ace Taxi Service, Inc., Ace Transportation LLC, Alex Collazo, Connecticut Medical Dispatch LLC, East Hartford Cab Company, Inc., Michael J. Olschafaskie* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard S. Gora* *Gora LLC* *30 Quarter Horse Drive* *Monroe, CT 06468*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Carl Burckhardt, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 04/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 04/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 04/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2019. Discovery due by 10/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Clerk on 04/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 25, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
April 25, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to ACE TRANSPORTATION LLC, Ace Taxi Service, Inc., ALEX COLLAZO, CONNECTICUT MEDICAL DISPATCH LLC, East Hartford Cab Company, Inc., MICHAEL J. OLSCHAFASKIE. (Gora, Richard)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACE TRANSPORTATION LLC, Ace Taxi Service, Inc., ALEX COLLAZO, CONNECTICUT MEDICAL DISPATCH LLC, East Hartford Cab Company, Inc., MICHAEL J. OLSCHAFASKIE ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5251960.), filed by CARL BURCKHARDT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gora, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burckhardt v. Olschafaskie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Medical Dispatch LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Olschafaskie
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Collazo
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Hartford Cab Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Taxi Service, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Transportation LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Burckhardt
Represented By: Richard S. Gora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?