Phillips et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Clyde B Phillips and Jane Lancelloti
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00623
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jane Lancelloti, Clyde B Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LeMoult, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/4/2020. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2020. (Ferguson, L.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE STATUS REPORT: As set forth in the attached document, the parties shall file a joint status report by March 4, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Form 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (ECF No. #12 ) is hereby APPROVED. All discovery shall be completed by 5/1/2020. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 6/1/2020. All other dates requested in this report are also approved. The court will issue a trial memorandum order once the dispositive motions deadline has passed. REMINDER: please refer to the electronic filing order in civil cases re the requirements for submission of chambers copies. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin W. Thompson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/12/2019. The deadlines in the Form 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (ECF No. #12 ) will apply. Total time: 4 minutes (Court Reporter Corinna Thompson.) (Jerjian, O.)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/4/2019. (Ferguson, L.)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Motion to Extend Time Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #16 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendant shall respond to the motion to dismiss by July 4, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/6/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply By Consent as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss until July 4, 2019 by Jane Lancelloti, Clyde B Phillips. (LeMoult, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2019 11:30 AM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Conference call information was emailed to counsel. (Jerjian, O.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piscopo, Nico)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Piscopo, Nico)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LeMoult, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. LeMoult on behalf of Jane Lancelloti, Clyde B Phillips (LeMoult, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nico Piscopo on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Piscopo, Nico)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #2 Notice (Other) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, and #4 Notice (Other) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Agati, Kathryn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/26/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/26/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/25/2019, Discovery due by 10/26/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 26, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Scapellati, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company of No Pending Motions (Scapellati, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Scapellati, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scapellati, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Stamford Superior Court, case number FST-CV19-6040737-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5254055, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scapellati, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde B Phillips
Represented By: Jon David Biller
Represented By: Michael J. LeMoult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Lancelloti
Represented By: Jon David Biller
Represented By: Michael J. LeMoult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Daniel P. Scapellati
Represented By: Nico Piscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?