Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., McMoore McLesst Publishing, Zombies Ate My Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Round Hill Music LP, Tokeco Tunes, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Forthefallen Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, Cyanide Publishing, Roys Boys LLC and Reservoir One America
Defendant: Amy Moore, Sara Miller and A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00650
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Answer to Complaint filed by Amy Moore. The Court accepts the answer as to Ms. Moore only. An artificial entity cannot proceed pro se and any person who represents an artificial entity must "be an attorney licensed to practice law before our courts," which Ms. Moore is not. Jones v. Niagara Frontier Transp. Auth., 722 F.2d 20, 22 (2d Cir. 1983). Ms. Moore is directed to file a notice of appearance under Local Rule 5(b) as to herself only. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/20/2019.(Gould, K.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Amy Moore.(Fanelle, N.)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 7/10/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (Gould, K.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C. d/b/a American Eagle Saloon & Cafe and Amy Moore and Sara Miller by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, Forthefallen Publishing, McMoore McLesst Publishing, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Roys Boys LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Zombies Ate My Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michael J. Rye)(Rye, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, Forthefallen Publishing, McMoore McLesst Publishing, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Roys Boys LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Zombies Ate My Publishing identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, Forthefallen Publishing, McMoore McLesst Publishing, Orbi-Lee Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Roys Boys LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Zombies Ate My Publishing. (Rye, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reservoir Media Management Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Cyanide Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Round Hill Music LP, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, McMoore McLesst Publishing, Forthefallen Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing. Amy Moore served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Rye, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reservoir Media Management Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Cyanide Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Round Hill Music LP, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, McMoore McLesst Publishing, Forthefallen Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing. Sara Miller served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Rye, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reservoir Media Management Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Cyanide Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Round Hill Music LP, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, McMoore McLesst Publishing, Forthefallen Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing. A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C. served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Rye, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibit) (Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Amy Moore* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Sara Miller* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., McMoore McLesst Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing, Zombies Ate My Publishing, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Forthefallen Publishing, Roys Boys LLC, Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Cyanide Publishing, Tokeco Tunes, E.O. Smith Music, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2019. Discovery due by 10/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Sara Miller. (Rye, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Amy Moore. (Rye, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C.. (Rye, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C., Sara Miller, Amy Moore ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5258640.), filed by Reservoir Media Management Inc., Roys Boys LLC, Cyanide Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Round Hill Music LP, Orbi-Lee Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zombies Ate My Publishing, E.O. Smith Music, McMoore McLesst Publishing, Forthefallen Publishing, R-Key Darkus Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule)(Rye, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McMoore McLesst Publishing
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zombies Ate My Publishing
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R-Key Darkus Publishing
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Round Hill Music LP
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbi-Lee Publishing
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forthefallen Publishing
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O. Smith Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roys Boys LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir One America
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M.P.M. - Willington L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?