Kearney v. Arroyo et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Kearney
Defendant: T Niestemski, D. Ortiz, Christine Arroyo, M. Johnson and Gregg Granello
Case Number: 3:2019cv00651
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Kearney. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Marshal Return)(Williams, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Christine Arroyo, Gregg Granello, M. Johnson, T Niestemski, D. Ortiz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph M. Merly* *John R. Williams & Associates, LLC* *51 Elm Street, Suite 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Aaron Kearney, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph M. Merly on behalf of Aaron Kearney, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2019. Discovery due by 10/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
April 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Williams, John)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Merly on behalf of Aaron Kearney (Williams, John) Modified on 4/30/2019 to correct attorney (Anastasio, F.).
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5258715.), filed by Aaron Kearney.(Williams, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearney v. Arroyo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Niestemski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Granello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Kearney
Represented By: Joseph M. Merly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?