Harel Pension and Provident Ltd. et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. and Harel Pension and Provident Ltd.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Sigurdur Olafsson, Maureen Cavanaugh, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V., Deborah Griffin, Michael McClellan, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Allan Oberman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00656
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey J. Stein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312359) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Stein, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erika Oliver to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312333) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Oliver, Erika)
June 20, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sara B. Polychron to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312437) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Polychron, Sara)
June 20, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Angel P. Lau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312260) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Lau, Angel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ryan A. Llorens to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312414) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Llorens, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric I. Niehaus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312312) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Niehaus, Eric)
June 20, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Luke O. Brooks to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312390) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Brooks, Luke)
June 14, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Stein on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Stein, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Polychron on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Polychron, Sara)
June 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Llorens on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Llorens, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Ian Niehaus on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Niehaus, Eric)
June 13, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Limpin Oliver on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Oliver, Erika)
June 13, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel P. Lau on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Lau, Angel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Orion Brooks on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Brooks, Luke)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Attorney Sara B. Polychron to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Attorney Ryan A. Llorens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Attorney Luke O. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Attorney Erika Oliver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Attorney Eric I. Niehaus to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Attorney Angel P. Lau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sara B. Polychron to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312437) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sara B. Polychron)(Narwold, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ryan A. Llorens to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312414) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan A. Llorens)(Narwold, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Luke O. Brooks to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312390) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Luke O. Brooks)(Narwold, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey J. Stein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312359) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey J. Stein)(Narwold, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erika Oliver to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312333) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erika Oliver)(Narwold, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric I. Niehaus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312312) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric I. Niehaus)(Narwold, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Angel P. Lau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312260) by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Angel P. Lau)(Narwold, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5290050) by Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Deborah Griffin, Michael McClellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Hershman, Jordan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Hershman on behalf of Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Deborah Griffin, Michael McClellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Hershman, Jordan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/28/2019. (Smith, E)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Attorney Jordan D. Hershman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/23/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay Action by Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Deborah Griffin, Michael McClellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Responses due by 6/12/2019 (O'Toole, Jill)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V.. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5290050) by Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Deborah Griffin, Michael McClellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/21/2019.(Gould, K.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Deborah Griffin, Michael McClellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew P. Jasinski on behalf of Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Jasinski, Mathew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd. (Narwold, William)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd., #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2019. Discovery due by 10/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 30, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5259380.), filed by Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd., Harel Pension and Provident Ltd., Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Narwold, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harel Pension and Provident Ltd. et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harel Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Eric Ian Niehaus
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Sara Polychron
Represented By: Erika Limpin Oliver
Represented By: Ryan Llorens
Represented By: Luke Orion Brooks
Represented By: Jeffrey Stein
Represented By: Angel P. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harel Insurance Investments & Financial Services Ltd.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Eric Ian Niehaus
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Sara Polychron
Represented By: Erika Limpin Oliver
Represented By: Ryan Llorens
Represented By: Luke Orion Brooks
Represented By: Jeffrey Stein
Represented By: Angel P. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icic - Israel Credit Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Eric Ian Niehaus
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Sara Polychron
Represented By: Erika Limpin Oliver
Represented By: Ryan Llorens
Represented By: Luke Orion Brooks
Represented By: Jeffrey Stein
Represented By: Angel P. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israeli Shares Partnership, E.M.I. - Ezer Mortgage Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Eric Ian Niehaus
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Sara Polychron
Represented By: Erika Limpin Oliver
Represented By: Ryan Llorens
Represented By: Luke Orion Brooks
Represented By: Jeffrey Stein
Represented By: Angel P. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harel Pension and Provident Ltd.
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Eric Ian Niehaus
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Sara Polychron
Represented By: Erika Limpin Oliver
Represented By: Ryan Llorens
Represented By: Luke Orion Brooks
Represented By: Jeffrey Stein
Represented By: Angel P. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dipankar Bhattacharjee
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Griffin
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McClellan
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Oberman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?