King et al v. Mad Jo 3, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Evan Roberts and Rebecca King
Defendant: Christopher Coyne, Mad Jo 3, LLC and Joann Manzo
Case Number: 3:2019cv00661
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to plead is extended to July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/2/2019. (Smith, E)
July 2, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. Answer due 7/15/2019. (Smith, E)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/15/2019 Respond to Complaint by Christopher Coyne, Mad Jo 3, LLC, Joann Manzo. (McWeeny, Tucker)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting First #17 Motion for Extension of Time until June 21, 2019 Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/3/2019 (Pincus, A).
June 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019 (Pincus, A).
June 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. Answer due 6/21/2019 (Pincus, A).
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2019 Respond to Complaint by Christopher Coyne, Mad Jo 3, LLC, Joann Manzo. (McWeeny, Tucker)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker McWeeny on behalf of Christopher Coyne, Mad Jo 3, LLC, Joann Manzo (McWeeny, Tucker)
May 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Mad Jo 3, LLC to 6/3/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Agent of Service for Mad Jo 3, LLC on 5/13/2019, filed by Rebecca King, Evan Roberts. (Labrencis, Jessica)
May 13, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Christopher Coyne to 5/27/2019; Mad Jo 3, LLC to 5/27/2019; Joann Manzo to 5/27/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christopher Coyne on 5/6/2019, filed by Rebecca King, Evan Roberts. (Labrencis, Jessica)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Joann Manzo on 5/6/2019, filed by Rebecca King, Evan Roberts. (Labrencis, Jessica)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mad Jo 3, LLC on 5/6/2019, filed by Rebecca King, Evan Roberts. (Labrencis, Jessica)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Christopher Coyne* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica Leigh Labrencis* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *60 Popieluszko Court* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mad Jo 3, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica Leigh Labrencis* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *60 Popieluszko Court* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Joann Manzo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica Leigh Labrencis* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *60 Popieluszko Court* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Joann Manzo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica Leigh Labrencis* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *221 Main Street* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mad Jo 3, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica Leigh Labrencis* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *221 Main Street* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Christopher Coyne* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jessica Leigh Labrencis* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *221 Main Street* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Rebecca King, Evan Roberts, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2019. Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Coyne, Mad Jo 3, LLC, Joann Manzo ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5260754.), filed by Rebecca King, Evan Roberts.(Labrencis, Jessica)
May 1, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Mad Jo 3, LLC. (Labrencis, Jessica)
May 1, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Christopher Coyne. (Labrencis, Jessica)
May 1, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Joann Manzo. (Labrencis, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Mad Jo 3, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Roberts
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Labrencis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca King
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Labrencis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Coyne
Represented By: Tucker McWeeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mad Jo 3, LLC
Represented By: Tucker McWeeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Manzo
Represented By: Tucker McWeeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?