Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. v. McGonagle
Plaintiff: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Defendant: Julia E McGonagle
Case Number: 3:2019cv00664
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert R. Marcus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5311405) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Marcus, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Marcus on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Marcus, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert R. Marcus. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert R. Marcus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5311405) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Marshall, Gregory)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Lincoln's Disclosures, Order re Disclosures served on Julia McGonagle on 5/18/2019, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Service on J.McGonagle)(Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Julia E McGonagle* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory Marshall* *Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP* *1615 L Street NW, Suite 1350 Washington, Suite 1350* *Washington, DC 20036*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co., #1 Complaint, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co., #6 Standing Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Proposed Summons filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Proposed Summons by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Marshall, Gregory) Modified on 5/2/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
May 2, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Julia E McGonagle. (Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julia E McGonagle ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5262467.), filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Coversheet)(Marshall, Gregory) Modified on 5/2/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. v. McGonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Robert Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia E McGonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?