In re: Rose
Appellee: John J. O'Neil
Appellant: Nicole M Rose and Magdalena Camplin
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
In Re: Tammy Marie Rose
Case Number: 3:2019cv00673
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nicole M Rose re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/31/2019 To File Brief (Kulig, Stephen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/31/2019 To File Brief by Nicole M Rose. (Kulig, Stephen)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 No Designation/Agreed Statement: Filed 19-673(AVC) (RE:) 60 Notice of Appeal to District Court. 56 Judgment Filed by Stephen T. Kulig on behalf of Nicole M Rose, Magdalena Camplin, Defendants. Appellant, Camplin, M and rose, Nicole. Appellee(s). Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 05/16/2019. Transmission of Designation due by 06/3/2019. filed by Defendant Magdalena Camplin, Defendant Nicole M Rose. (Fanelle, N.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/3/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 18-02022, 17-21333, filed by Nicole M Rose, Magdalena Camplin. (Attachments: #1 Judgment #56)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John J. O'Neil
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nicole M Rose
Represented By: Stephen T. Kulig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Magdalena Camplin
Represented By: Stephen T. Kulig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Tammy Marie Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?