Guzman et al v. Northland Investment Corp et al
Plaintiff: Leeza Skovinski, J. S., J. Z. G., Calixmarie Guzman and J. G.
Defendant: Northland Investment Corp. and Lawrence R. Gottesdiener
Case Number: 3:2019cv00680
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 3:18-cv-01804-JBA. (Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Join Conference, on the record 6/24/19. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/24/19. (Tooker, A.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Daley on behalf of Lawrence R. Gottesdiener, Northland Investment Corp. (Daley, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #14 Objection filed by J. Z. G., J. G., Calixmarie Guzman, J. S., Leeza Skovinski. (Rosen, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Join Pre-Filing Conference in Another Case As Non-Parties filed by Lawrence R. Gottesdiener, Northland Investment Corp.. (Kurzman, Marc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Join Conference by J. Z. G., J. G., Calixmarie Guzman, J. S., Leeza Skovinski (Rosen, David) Modified on 6/21/2019 to change event to a motion (Reis, Julia).
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Kurzman on behalf of Lawrence R. Gottesdiener, Northland Investment Corp. (Kurzman, Marc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet Bond Arterton for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/30/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lawrence R. Gottesdiener waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/13/2019 filed by J. Z. G.; J. G.; Calixmarie Guzman; J. S.; Leeza Skovinski. (Rosen, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Northland Investment Corp. waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/13/2019 filed by J. Z. G.; J. G.; Calixmarie Guzman; J. S.; Leeza Skovinski. (Rosen, David)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander T. Taubes on behalf of J. Z. G., J. G., Calixmarie Guzman, J. S., Leeza Skovinski (Taubes, Alexander)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by J. Z. G., Leeza Skovinski, J. G., J. S., Calixmarie Guzman, #2 Notice of Related Case filed by J. Z. G., Leeza Skovinski, J. G., J. S., Calixmarie Guzman, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 05/07/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lawrence R. Gottesdiener, Northland Investment Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David N. Rosen* *David N. Rosen & Associates, P.C.* *400 Orange St* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Barry, Donna)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/06/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/06/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2019, Discovery due by 11/5/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/06/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 6, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by All Plaintiffs (Rosen, David)
May 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rosen, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5266987.), filed by Leeza Skovinski, Calixmarie Guzman, J. Z.G., J. G., J. S..(Rosen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman et al v. Northland Investment Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northland Investment Corp.
Represented By: Marc J. Kurzman
Represented By: Brian A. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence R. Gottesdiener
Represented By: Marc J. Kurzman
Represented By: Brian A. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeza Skovinski
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. S.
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Z. G.
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calixmarie Guzman
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. G.
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?