Sparano v. JLO Automotive, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Sparano
Defendant: JLO Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00681
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Ryan, Sarah)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Faulkner, Joanne)
May 24, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/5/2019 (Perez, J.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by JLO Automotive, Inc.. (Katz, Johanna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JLO Automotive, Inc. waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/6/2019 filed by JLO Automotive, Inc.. (Hawks-Ladds, Joshua)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna S. Katz on behalf of JLO Automotive, Inc. (Katz, Johanna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Hawks-Ladds on behalf of JLO Automotive, Inc. (Hawks-Ladds, Joshua)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by James Sparano, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/6/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/6/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2019. Discovery due by 11/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 6, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JLO Automotive, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5267301.), filed by James Sparano.(Faulkner, Joanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparano v. JLO Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sparano
Represented By: Joanne S. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLO Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Johanna S. Katz
Represented By: Joshua A. Hawks-Ladds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?