Lloyd v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Robert Lloyd
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00708
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: 7 Case Transferred Out. CASE: 3:19-cv-00708 DETAILS: Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-03579, filed 06/21/2019. (Hushin, Z.) Modified on 6/25/2019 to correct file date (Hushin, Z.).
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred to the District of California- Northern. (Hushin, Z.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel. Signed by Clerk on 6/18/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Robert Lloyd, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2019 Discovery due by 11/9/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Lloyd ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5274342.), filed by Robert Lloyd.(Smith, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lloyd
Represented By: J. Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?