Housing Authority of the City of New Haven v. Delucia et al

Plaintiff: Housing Authority of the City of New Haven
Defendant: Maria Soto, Nelson Alvarez, Alfredo Soto and Jennifer Delucia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00709
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why the court should not dismiss this case for failure to prosecute as a result of the plaintiffs failure to move for a default entry against the defendant. Plaintiff should file its response by July 11, 2019. Failure to respond by said date may result in the dismissal of this case. Show Cause Response due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/27/2019.(Lewis, D)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Housing Authority of the City of New Haven. Alfredo Soto served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019; Maria Soto served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Harris, Rebecca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Housing Authority of the City of New Haven. Nelson Alvarez served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019; Jennifer Delucia served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019; Alfredo Soto served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019; Maria Soto served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Harris, Rebecca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Housing Authority of the City of New Haven. Maria Soto served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/8/2019. (Harris, Rebecca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Housing Authority of the City of New Haven. Alfredo Soto served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/8/2019. (Harris, Rebecca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nelson Alvarez, Jennifer Delucia, Alfredo Soto, Maria Soto* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Rebecca M. Harris* *Crumbie Law Group, LLC* *100 Pearl Street 12th Fl.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Housing Authority of the City of New Haven, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery, Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2019 Discovery due by 11/9/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 10, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Harris, Rebecca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5274578.), filed by Housing Authority of the City of New Haven.(Harris, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Housing Authority of the City of New Haven v. Delucia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Delucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Authority of the City of New Haven
Represented By: Rebecca M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?