Persin v. Lapenta et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J Persin
Defendant: Steven G Virtue, Charles J Schafer, Robert V. Lapenta, Jr., Robert V. Lapenta, William D Ingram, Dennis McCarthy, James A Depalma and Robert A Basil
Petitioner: Robert Flos, Betsy Wages, Giovanni Vecchiato and Dale Barton
Nominal Defendant: Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00716
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/1/19. (Tooker, A.)
June 28, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 3:19-cv-00621-JBA. (Reis, Julia)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet Bond Arterton for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/19/2019.(Perez, J.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:19-CV-00721 (MPS) and 3:19-CV-00621 (JBA) filed by Betsy Wages, Dale Barton, Robert Flos, Giovanni Vecchiato. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Steven M. Frederick, #3 Exhibit A - BFV Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Persin Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Wages Complaint, #6 Exhibit D - May 6, 2019 8-K, #7 Exhibit E - May 13, 2019 8-K, #8 Exhibit F - BES Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit G - Wofsey Firm Resume, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillipps, Zachary)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/6/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time #1 Complaint, by Ronald J Persin. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:19-CV-00721 (MPS) and 3:19-CV-00621 (JBA) by Ronald J Persin.Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Shapiro Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Shapiro Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Shapiro Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Shapiro Declaration)(Shapiro, Jonathan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Robert A Basil, James A Depalma, William D Ingram, Robert V. Lapenta, Robert V. Lapenta, Jr., Dennis McCarthy, Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan M. Shapiro* *Shapiro Law Offices, LLC* *32 Washington St.* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Ronald J Persin Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2019. Discovery due by 11/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 10, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Robert A Basil, James A Depalma, William D Ingram, Robert V. Lapenta, Robert V. Lapenta, Jr., Dennis McCarthy, Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc.. (Shapiro, Jonathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert A Basil, James A Depalma, William D Ingram, Robert V. Lapenta, Robert V. Lapenta, Jr., Dennis McCarthy, Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc., Charles J Schafer, Steven G Virtue ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5275373.), filed by Ronald J Persin.(Shapiro, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Persin v. Lapenta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Persin
Represented By: Jonathan M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven G Virtue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert V. Lapenta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert V. Lapenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Depalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A Basil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Flos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Betsy Wages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Giovanni Vecchiato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?