Terranova v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Scott J. Terranova
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00718
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/15/2019. Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. Responsive pleading due by 8/15/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant's response to the Complaint and the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are due on or before August 15, 2019. The Court notes that the parties dispute concerning the original deadline for the Rule 26(f) Report can be resolved by consulting Paragraph (1) of Local Rule 26(f). Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 15, 2019to Respond to the Complaint and for the Parties to File Their Planning Report by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Dym, Gabriel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel T. Dym on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Dym, Gabriel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/13/2019 filed by Scott J. Terranova. (Faulkner, Joanne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Scott J. Terranova, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 11/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 13, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5276144.), filed by Scott J. Terranova.(Faulkner, Joanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terranova v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Gabriel T. Dym
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J. Terranova
Represented By: Joanne S. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?