In re: Speer
Appellant: Sheri Speer
Appellee: Michael Tieger, Clipper Realty Trust, SLS Heating, LLC and Seaport Capital Partners, LLC
Interested Party: Bonnie Mangan
Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00738
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to counsel regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/25/19. (Ferguson, L.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff is permitted to participate in electronic filing upon completion of the required training class and registering for a PACER account. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/25/2019. (Patel, R.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna N. Sternberg on behalf of Seaport Capital Partners, LLC as Co-Counsel (Sternberg, Jenna)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Appellant's BRIEF by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Agati, Kathryn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Sheri Speer. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Preliminary Statement of Issues on #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Sheri Speer. (Agati, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #1 envelope) (Agati, Kathryn).
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Designation of Necessary Record for #1 Appeal by Sheri Speer. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PRO SE APPELLANT: Appellant Sherri Speer was required to file her "designation of items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented," Fed. R. Bank. Pro. 8009(a)(1)(A), by May 28, 2019. The court is sua sponte granting the pro se appellant an extension to June 27, 2019 to comply with Rule 8009. Failure by the appellant to file her designation of items and statement of issues by that date will result in dismissal of her appeal. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Patel, R.)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 No Designation/Agreed Statement: Filed, 19-738(AWT)(RE:) 1811 Notice of Appeal to District Court Filed by Debtor Sheri Speer. Re: 1806 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case. Appellant, Sheri Speer. Appellee(s), Michael Tieger, Clipper Realty Trust, SLS Heaating, LLC and Seaport Capital Partners, LLC. Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 5/28/2019. Transmission of Designation due by 6/13/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/15/2019.(Fanelle, N.)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/15/2019.(Fanelle, N.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 14-21007, filed by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Order #1806)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sheri Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Tieger
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clipper Realty Trust
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Represented By: Donna R. Skaats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SLS Heating, LLC
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Seaport Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Represented By: Jenna N. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bonnie Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?