Norris v. General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union

Plaintiff: Lorna Norris
Defendant: General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union and GE Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv00741
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Douglas Bullard on behalf of General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union (Bullard, Andrew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Blatchley on behalf of General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union (Blatchley, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT as of right against General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union, filed by Lorna Norris.(Faulkner, Joanne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Cost and Fees per Rule 4 failure to waive service by Lorna Norris.Responses due by 7/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Rule 4 costs and fees, #2 Affidavit fees)(Faulkner, Joanne)
June 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorna Norris. General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Faulkner, Joanne)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joanne S. Faulkner* *Law Offices of Joanne Faulkner* *123 Avon St.* *New Haven, CT 06511-2422*. (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union. (Faulkner, Joanne)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Lorna Norris, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2019. Discovery due by 11/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5281134.), filed by Lorna Norris.(Faulkner, Joanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris v. General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Employees Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Thomas C. Blatchley
Represented By: Andrew Douglas Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Credit Union
Represented By: Thomas C. Blatchley
Represented By: Andrew Douglas Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Norris
Represented By: Joanne S. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?