Gorawara v. Caprio et al
Plaintiff: Rahul Gorawara
Defendant: Carolyn Caprio and John Caprio
Case Number: 3:2019cv00756
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rahul Gorawara. Carolyn Caprio served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019; John Caprio served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Gorawara, Rahul)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The #11 motion for extension is GRANTED. The Defendants shall have until July 18, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/19/2019. (Ram, Megha)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/18/2019 To file Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Carolyn Caprio, John Caprio. (Connors, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard F. Connors on behalf of Carolyn Caprio, John Caprio (Connors, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/21/19.(Johnson, D.)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The #3 motion to participate in electronic filing is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/21/2019. (Ram, Megha)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Carolyn Caprio, John Caprio* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Rahul Gorawara* *P.O. Box 208200, SOM-PHD* *New Haven, CT 06520*. (Reis, Julia)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Rahul Gorawara, #2 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Rahul Gorawara, #3 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing filed by Rahul Gorawara, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/17/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/17/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2019 Discovery due by 11/16/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Rahul Gorawara. (Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to Electronic Notice by Rahul Gorawara (Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn Caprio, John Caprio, filed by Rahul Gorawara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Filing fee received from Rahul Gorawara: $400, manual receipt number 153316 (Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Carolyn Caprio, John Caprio. (Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorawara v. Caprio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahul Gorawara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Caprio
Represented By: Richard F. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Caprio
Represented By: Richard F. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?