Greca Plaza, LLC v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Greca Plaza, LLC
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00773
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Parrott on behalf of Greca Plaza, LLC (Parrott, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Merrill Isaac on behalf of Greca Plaza, LLC (Isaac, Leonard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Lexington Insurance Company.(Murphy, Courtney)
May 28, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #9 Electronic Service Documents - updated on 5/28/2019 to add Standing Order on Removed Cases attachment (Agati, Kathryn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint)(Murphy, Courtney)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Lexington Insurance Company, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Lexington Insurance Company, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Lexington Insurance Company, #8 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lexington Insurance Company, and #5 Notice (Other) filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Agati, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Agati, Kathryn).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/21/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/21/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2019, Discovery due by 11/20/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 21, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company of Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Murphy, Courtney)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. (Murphy, Courtney)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company of Civil Cover Sheet (Murphy, Courtney)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney E. Murphy on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Murphy, Courtney)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexington Insurance Company from Superior Court of J.D. of Hartford Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5288593, filed by Lexington Insurance Company.(Murphy, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greca Plaza, LLC v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greca Plaza, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Parrott
Represented By: Leonard Merrill Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtney E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?