Cote v. TD Auto Finance LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Cote
Defendant: TD Auto Finance LLC and Hartford Auto Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00785
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 First Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parents, TD Bank, N. A., TD Bank US Holding Company, TD Group US Holdings LCC, and The Toronto-Dominion Bank by TD Auto Finance LLC. (Fox, Shawn) Modified on 7/17/2019 to edit text to include the names of the Corporate Parents (Ferguson, L.).
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by TD Auto Finance LLC.(Fox, Shawn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford Auto Group, Inc., TD Auto Finance LLC, filed by Brenda Cote.(Blinn, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Motion for Default for Failure to Plead (ECF No. #11 ) is hereby DENIED with respect to Hartford Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Mac Mitsubishi because the court granted the plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint and this defendant may be prompted to respond to the amended complaint. See ECF No. 13 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/25/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #12 ) is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff shall docket the amended complaint separately forthwith. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/25/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Brenda Cote.Responses due by 7/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Amended Complaint)(Blinn, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) for Failure to Appear and answer the Complaint as to Hartford Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Mac Mitsubishi by Brenda Cote. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Lorenz Mahoney on behalf of Brenda Cote (Mahoney, Brendan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Cote. TD Auto Finance LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Cote. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *TD Auto Finance LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Auto Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Brenda Cote, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/22/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/22/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019, Discovery due by 11/21/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 22, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Bauer, J.)
May 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to TD Auto Finance LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Auto Group, Inc.. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Auto Group, Inc., TD Auto Finance LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5289555.), filed by Brenda Cote.(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cote v. TD Auto Finance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance LLC
Represented By: Shawn Randall Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cote
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Represented By: Brendan Lorenz Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?