Yuhas v. Valenti VW-Suzuki, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cathy Yuhas
Defendant: Valenti VW Suzuki, Inc. and Scient Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv00787
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019, at 10:00AM, before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This case has been referred to Judge Merriam for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on 8/2/2019, at 10:00AM. A firm date for the settlement conference will be set during that telephone call. The Court requires all named parties and any other persons necessary to achieve full settlement (such as insurance representatives) to attend the settlement conference in person. Therefore, counsel must consult with their clients and other necessary parties prior to the telephone call to determine any dates on which they will be unavailable in the next 120 days. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to facilitate scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the conference to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. (Katz, S.)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/18/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER ON JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/18/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the Parties' #18 Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except that the Parties' Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the deadlines and procedures set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Defendants shall respond to the Complaint or any amended complaint by August 15, 2019. The Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by November 4, 2019. The Defendants shall move to join additional parties by December 4, 2019. Discovery shall be completed by May 15, 2020. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by July 1, 2020. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed by July 1, 2020, unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case it shall be filed within 45 days of the Court's ruling thereon. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for May 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Set Deadlines/Hearings:Answer updated for All Defendants: Responsive Pleading due by 8/15/2019Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2019Discovery due by 5/15/2020Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2020Joint Trial Memorandum due by 7/1/2020, unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case it shall be filed within 45 days of the Court's ruling thereonTelephonic Status Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/18/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blinn, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Scient Federal Credit Union to 7/30/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Summons issued as to Scient Federal Credit Union should have indicated that a responsive pleading was due within 21 days of service. Given the circumstances, however, Scient Federal Credit Union may have until July 30, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/3/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default by Scient Federal Credit Union. (DeBassio, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Anthony DeBassio on behalf of Scient Federal Credit Union (DeBassio, David)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 7/26/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Gould, K.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Scient Federal Credit Union by Cathy Yuhas. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Valenti VW Suzuki, Inc. to 7/13/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting on consent #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading from defendant Valente VW Suzuki, Inc. due 7/13/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/13/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 13, 2019 to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Valenti VW Suzuki, Inc.. (Greene, Kevin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Yuhas. Scient Federal Credit Union served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Yuhas. Valenti VW Suzuki, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Lorenz Mahoney on behalf of Cathy Yuhas (Mahoney, Brendan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Valenti VW Suzuki, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Scient Federal Credit Union* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Cathy Yuhas, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019. Discovery due by 11/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 22, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Bauer, J.)
May 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Valenti VW-Suzuki, Inc.. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Scient Federal Credit Union. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scient Federal Credit Union, Valenti VW-Suzuki, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5289704.), filed by Cathy Yuhas.(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuhas v. Valenti VW-Suzuki, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Yuhas
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Represented By: Brendan Lorenz Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valenti VW Suzuki, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scient Federal Credit Union
Represented By: David Anthony DeBassio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?