Enfield v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Town of Enfield
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Beverly Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan PLC, Jonathan Sackler, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., David Sackler, Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, Rite Aid Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Richard Sackler, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, SpecGX LLC, Walmart, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Actavis PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P. doing business as Purdue Pharma (Delaware) Limited Partnership and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00789
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45581, filed 07/08/2019. (Oliver, T.)
July 1, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (Oliver, T.)
June 28, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR - JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Reis, Julia) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (Barry, Donna).
June 28, 2019 Filing 78 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Clerk John W, Nichols, MDL Panel.(Reis, Julia)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 MOTION for Attorney Stacey Anne Mahoney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 20, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacey Anne Mahoney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5327928) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Affidavit Supporting Pro Hac Admission, #2 Exhibit B. Certificate of Good Standing)(Wasil, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314983) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Pepe, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Pepe on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Pepe, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mara Leventhal, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314722) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Leventhal, Mara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Leventhal on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Leventhal, Mara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314949) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Joseph, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Joseph, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE by Insys Therapeutics, Inc. of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay (Cerrito, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312513) by Town of Enfield. (Cleemann, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cleemann on behalf of Town of Enfield (Cleemann, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judith S. Scolnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312479) by Town of Enfield. (Scolnick, Judith)
June 14, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith S. Scolnick on behalf of Town of Enfield (Scolnick, Judith)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 MOTION for Attorney Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #59 MOTION for Attorney Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #58 MOTION for Attorney Mara Leventhal, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Pepe, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314983) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Douglas J. Pepe, Esq.)(Frost, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregory P. Joseph, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314949) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Gregory P. Joseph, Esq.)(Frost, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mara Leventhal, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314722) by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mara Leventhal, Esq.)(Frost, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 MOTION for Attorney Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 MOTION for Attorney Judith S. Scolnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312513) by Town of Enfield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph G. Cleemann)(Ferron, Margaret)
June 10, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judith S. Scolnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312479) by Town of Enfield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Judith S. Scolnick)(Ferron, Margaret)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Motions for Extension of Time #23 #26 #31 #34 #37 . Granting Motion to Stay #45 . Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference #50 is granted, and the telephonic scheduling conference will be cancelled pending the stay. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/10/19. (Tooker, A.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edwin Dwyer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 MOTION for Attorney Alex J. Harris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/10/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2019. (Tooker, A.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Continue Pre-Scheduling Conference by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Daily, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alex J. Harris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5310281) by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alex J. Harris, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Daily, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Richard Sackler (Frost, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler (Frost, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Romanowska Larson on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Larson, Agnieszka)
June 5, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Opiate MDL by Walmart, Inc..Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Chase, Terri)
June 4, 2019 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Spears, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Eastwood, Janna)
June 4, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Spears, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Martin, David)
May 30, 2019 A telephonic pre-scheduling conference will be held June 12, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for Purdue Pharma shall initiate the conference call to chambers. Chambers conference call dial in number: 203-773-2737. (Tooker, A.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Removal Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Daily, Thomas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Wasil, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Matthew Abramoske on behalf of Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc. (Abramoske, Bryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after court's decision on Plaintiff's motion to remand or MDL decision on conditional transfer to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(F) Planning Conference #1 Notice of Removal, by John Kapoor. (Richard, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Cox, Maureen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Robertson, Jr on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc. (Robertson, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time #1 Notice of Removal, by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Cox, Maureen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Danehy Cox on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc. (Cox, Maureen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Noonan, Patrick)
May 28, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for the individual Sackler Defendants to to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Kiernan, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Noonan, Patrick)
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wasil on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Wasil, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richard on behalf of John Kapoor (Richard, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Lyons, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chase, Terri)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Chase, Terri)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri L. Chase on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Chase, Terri)
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference #1 Notice of Removal, by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Rinehart on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Rinehart, Kim)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sheldon, Tara)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Sheldon, Tara)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc. for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Lyons, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret B. Ferron on behalf of Town of Enfield (Ferron, Margaret)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Martin on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Martin, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Romanowska Larson on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Larson, Agnieszka)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Actavis Inc (D'Ambrosio, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #2 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #5 Notice of Related Case filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2019 Discovery due by 11/21/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 Replacement PDF) (Reis, Julia).
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Daily, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Daily, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Daily, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. - Notice of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Daily, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. from Superior Court, Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV-19-6110751-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5289758, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 Walgreens Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 All Court Filings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daily, Thomas)
May 22, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Bauer, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enfield v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Represented By: Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Mara Leventhal
Represented By: Gregory P. Joseph
Represented By: Douglas J. Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: James K. Robertson, Jr.
Represented By: Maureen Danehy Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas V. Daily
Represented By: Agnieszka Romanowska Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: David T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edwin Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Abramoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: John P. D'Ambrosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Terri L. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Edwin Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: John P. D'Ambrosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P. doing business as Purdue Pharma (Delaware) Limited Partnership
Represented By: Kim E. Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Enfield
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Represented By: Judith S. Scolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?