SC Johnson & Son Inc v. Henkel Corp
Plaintiff: SC Johnson & Son Inc
Defendant: Henkel Corp
Case Number: 3:2019cv00805
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the court refers the #118 motion to compel and the #134 motion to compel to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/22/2020.(Bozek, M.)
July 16, 2020 Reset Deadlines per #151 Order: Discovery due by 6/21/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/21/2021 Joint Trial Memorandum due by 10/18/2021. Trial Ready Date 12/13/2021. (Bozek, M.)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting the parties #149 joint motion to amend the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/20/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #148 motion for an order referring the #118 and #134 motions to compel to a magistrate judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/16/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 149 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #141 Scheduling Order by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 8/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Third Amended Scheduling Order)(Davenport, Andrea)
June 4, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION for Referral to Magistrate - NOTICE by SC Johnson & Son Inc re #134 MOTION to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests, #118 MOTION to Compel (Request for Referral to Magistrate) (Regan, James) Modified on 6/9/2020 to change to motion event/relief (Bozek, M.).
March 24, 2020 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT re #146 Reply to Response to Motion Signed By Andrea M. Davenport filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Regan, James)
March 24, 2020 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to #134 MOTION to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Regan, James)
March 10, 2020 Filing 145 OBJECTION re #135 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #134 MOTION to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests, #136 Affidavit Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests filed by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tiffany A. Miao in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests)(Heath, Edward)
February 28, 2020 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT re #142 Reply to Response to Motion Signed By Miranda McKinnon filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
February 28, 2020 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT re #142 Reply to Response to Motion Signed By Jessica Hutson Polakowski filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Regan, James)
February 28, 2020 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to #113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Regan, James)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: All Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/30/2020. Joint Trial Memorandum due by 3/26/2021. Trial Ready Date 5/24/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/26/2020.(Bozek, M.)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting the #139 motion to amend the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/26/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 139 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #109 Scheduling Order by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 3/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Davenport, Andrea)
February 21, 2020 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT re #118 MOTION to Compel Signed By Monica Mark filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Polakowski, Jessica)
February 21, 2020 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to #118 MOTION to Compel filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Polakowski, Jessica)
February 18, 2020 Filing 136 AFFIDAVIT re #134 MOTION to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests Signed By Andrea M. Davenport filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Regan, James)
February 18, 2020 Filing 135 Memorandum in Support re #134 MOTION to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
February 18, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION to Compel and to Require Sufficient Answers to Discovery Requests by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 3/10/2020 (Regan, James)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Ruling denying #114 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/18/2020. (Bozek, M.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT re #131 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, DECLARATION OF JAVIER ANDRADE-MARIN IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTIONS FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed By JAVIER ANDRADE-MARIN filed by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward)
February 14, 2020 Filing 131 Memorandum in Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTIONS FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward)
February 14, 2020 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT re #129 Objection Declaration of Tiffany A. Miao in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Require Sufficient Answers to Requests for Admission Signed By Tiffany A. Miao filed by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Heath, Edward)
February 14, 2020 Filing 129 OBJECTION re #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #118 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion to Require Sufficient Answers to Requests For Admission filed by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward)
January 31, 2020 Filing 128 OBJECTION re #115 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Request for an Ex Parte TRO and Request for a Consolidated Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Renewed Injunction Motions filed by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER VACATING order 125 referring the #118 motion to compel to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/30/2018.(Sondergeld, C.)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER VACATING order 124 referring the #113 motion for a preliminary injunction and the #114 motion for a temporary restraining order to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/30/2020.(Sondergeld, C.)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 VACATED - Order referring the #118 motion to compel to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for a ruling, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/29/2020.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Bozek, M.) Modified on 1/30/2020 to mark as vacated. See 127 Order. (Bozek, M.).
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 VACATED - Order referring the #113 motion for a preliminary injunction and the #114 motion for a temporary restraining order to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for a recommended ruling, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 636(b)(1)(B). Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/29/2020.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Bozek, M.) Modified on 1/30/2020 to mark as vacated. See 126 Order (Bozek, M.).
January 27, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE by SC Johnson & Son Inc Request for Referral to Magistrate (Polakowski, Jessica)
January 27, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE by SC Johnson & Son Inc Request for Referral to Magistrate (Polakowski, Jessica)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting the #120 motion to seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jessica Polakowski (dkt. no. 117-1), absent objection. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/27/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 120 Emergency MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jessica Polakowski (Dkt. No. 117-1) by Henkel Corp. (Modzelewski, Charles)
January 24, 2020 Filing 119 Memorandum in Support re #118 MOTION to Compel filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Polakowski, Jessica)
January 24, 2020 Filing 118 MOTION to Compel by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Polakowski, Jessica)
January 24, 2020 Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT re #113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Signed By Jessica H. Polakowski filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Polakowski, Jessica)
January 24, 2020 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT re #113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Signed By Miranda McKinnon filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Polakowski, Jessica)
January 24, 2020 Filing 115 Memorandum in Support re #113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Polakowski, Jessica)
January 24, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polakowski, Jessica)
January 24, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Polakowski, Jessica)
January 22, 2020 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 1/22/2020. Case not settled. Follow-up Status Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. (Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, contact Chambers at 203-579-5593.) Total Time: 5 hours and 30 minutes (Buchanan, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 12/10/2019. Upon request of both parties, Settlement Conference set for 12/17/2019 has been rescheduled to January 22, 2020 @ 10:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's Chambers, Room 429, prior to the settlement conference.) 30 minutes (Buchanan, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying #54 motion for TRO; denying #55 motion for preliminary injunction; denying #95 motion to compel, without prejudice, in light of the pending settlement efforts. The parties may re-file the motions, if necessary, if settlement negotiations are not successful and in doing so, may adopt any part of the previously filed motions. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/08/19. (Covello, Alfred)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/16/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/28/2020. Joint Trial Memorandum due by 11/20/2020. Trial Ready Date 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/7/2019.(Bozek, M.)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 motion to amend scheduling order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/7/2019. (Sondergeld, C.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #44 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 11/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Davenport, Andrea)
November 6, 2019 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 11/6/2019. (Settlement Conference set for 12/17/2019 @ 10:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's Chambers, Room 429, prior to the settlement conference. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IS ATTACHED FOR REVIEW.). 15 minutes (Buchanan, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 11/6/2019 @ 2:30 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, contact Chambers at 203-579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 190 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Buchanan, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/25/2019. (Covello, Alfred)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #101 motion for conference. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/25/2019. (Covello, Alfred)
October 24, 2019 Filing 102 RESPONSE re #99 Notice (Other), #100 Affidavit Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Declaration in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motions for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Siegal)(Heath, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Filing 101 Motion for Conference - Joint NOTICE by Henkel Corp Joint Request for Referral to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference (Heath, Edward) Modified on 10/23/2019 to add motion event/relief (Bozek, M.).
October 21, 2019 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT re #55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #54 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration) Signed By Jacquilyn McKiernan filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE by SC Johnson & Son Inc re #55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #54 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Supplemental Declaration in Further Support of Plaintiff S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Regan, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT re #96 Memorandum in Support of Motion Signed By Monica A. Mark filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT re #96 Memorandum in Support of Motion Signed By Jessica H. Polakowski filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Regan, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 96 Memorandum in Support re #95 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Require Sufficient Answers to Requests for Admission filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Regan, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Require Sufficient Answers to Requests for Admission by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Regan, James)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/26/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 motion for stipulated protective order. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 08/26/19. (Codeanne, K.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 92 Consent MOTION Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Henkel Corp.Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Errata A)(Heath, Edward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 91 AFFIDAVIT re #90 Reply to Response to Motion Signed By Greg Jensen filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Regan, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to #55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #54 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Miriam Healey on behalf of SC Johnson & Son Inc (Healey, Angela)
July 18, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE by Henkel Corp Letter to Court (Heath, Edward)
July 17, 2019 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT re #86 Objection, (Declaration of Robert Stave) Signed By Robert Stave filed by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward)
July 16, 2019 Filing 86 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's #55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #54 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Cecil with Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Sandra Rubino Pisarczyk with Exhibits)(Murphy, Tatihana)
July 16, 2019 Filing 85 ENTERED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT re #82 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Signed By Michael D. Cecil filed by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Heath, Edward) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
July 16, 2019 Filing 84 ENTERED IN ERROR-AFFIDAVIT re #82 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Signed By Sandra Rubino Pisarczyk filed by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heath, Edward) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
July 16, 2019 Filing 83 ENTERED IN ERROR- MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
July 16, 2019 Filing 82 ENTERED IN ERROR- MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
July 16, 2019 Filing 81 ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint by Henkel Corp.(Heath, Edward)
July 12, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M Davenport on behalf of SC Johnson & Son Inc (Davenport, Andrea)
July 10, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica A Mark on behalf of SC Johnson & Son Inc (Mark, Monica)
July 10, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Hutson Polakowski on behalf of SC Johnson & Son Inc (Polakowski, Jessica)
July 9, 2019 Filing 77 Supplemental REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Regan, James)
June 28, 2019 Set Response Deadlines as to #55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #54 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Responses due by 7/16/2019. See 76 Order. (Bozek, M.)
June 28, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Henkel Corp to 7/16/2019. See 76 Order. (Bozek, M.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 motion for extension of time to respond to and including July 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/28/19. (Codeanne, K.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tiffany A. Miao to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5332698) by Henkel Corp. (Miao, Tiffany)
June 28, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #59 MOTION for Attorney(s) John Siegal to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5332682) by Henkel Corp. (Siegal, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 73 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 16, 2019 Respond to Amended Complaint and Serve its Opposition to Plaintiff's motions for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction by Henkel Corp. (Heath, Edward)
June 27, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica H. Polakowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5333440) by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Monica A. Mark to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5333458) by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #63 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrea M. Davenport to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5333474) by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Miao on behalf of Henkel Corp (Miao, Tiffany)
June 27, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by John Siegal on behalf of Henkel Corp (Siegal, John)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #59 motion to appear; granting #60 motion to appear. Certificate of good standing due by 8/25/2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/26/19. (Covello, Alfred)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Attorney Andrea M. Davenport to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Bozek, M.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Attorney Monica A. Mark to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Bozek, M.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Attorney Jessica H. Polakowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Bozek, M.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrea M. Davenport to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5333474) by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Andrea M. Davenport))(Regan, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Monica A. Mark to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5333458) by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Monica A. Mark))(Regan, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica H. Polakowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5333440) by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Jessica H. Polakowski))(Regan, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tiffany A. Miao to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5332698) by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Tiffany Miao)(Heath, Edward)
June 24, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney(s) John Siegal to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5332682) by Henkel Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Siegal)(Heath, Edward)
June 24, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Heath on behalf of Henkel Corp (Heath, Edward)
June 24, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Modzelewski on behalf of Henkel Corp (Modzelewski, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 56 Memorandum in Support re #55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #54 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SC Johnson & Son Inc.Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Regan, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Regan, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Henkel Corp, filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sample Advertising))(Regan, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Consent to Amend Complaint by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Regan, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany A. Killian on behalf of SC Johnson & Son Inc (Killian, Brittany)
June 21, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by James Emory Regan on behalf of SC Johnson & Son Inc (Regan, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 49 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (Bozek, M.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 48 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 5/29/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/24/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/23/2019. Discovery due by 11/23/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 43 Case electronically transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00375.
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/24/2019: GRANTING #26 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case; DENYING as moot #26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and ORDERING that this action be TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Henkel Corporation re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities)(Flaherty, Daniel)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/8/2019 DENYING #34 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
May 3, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION of John Siegal in Opposition to Plaintiff's Civil L.R. 7(H) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trial Scheduling Order)(Siegal, John)
May 3, 2019 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Henkel Corporation re #34 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Compel . (Siegal, John)
April 30, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Jessica H. Polakowski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jessica H. Polakowski)(Polakowski, Jessica)
April 30, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities)(Polakowski, Jessica)
April 26, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Andrea M. Davenport (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davenport, Andrea)
April 26, 2019 Filing 34 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Compel by All Plaintiffs. (Davenport, Andrea)
April 10, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Cheryl Truesdale in Support of Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Polakowski, Jessica)
April 10, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Jacquilyn McKiernan in Support of Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Jacquilyn McKiernan)(Polakowski, Jessica)
April 10, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Gail McGurgan in Support of Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Polakowski, Jessica)
April 10, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Tara Kowalski in Support of Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Second Declaration of Tara Kowalski, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Second Declaration of Tara Kowalski, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Second Declaration of Tara Kowalski, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Second Declaration of Tara Kowalski)(Polakowski, Jessica)
April 10, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities)(Polakowski, Jessica)
April 9, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Michael D. Cecil in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer (Flaherty, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF in Support filed by Henkel Corporation re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities)(Flaherty, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or MOTION to Transfer by Henkel Corporation. (Flaherty, Daniel). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 4/10/2019 (asc).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on April 9, 2019. Interim Settlement Report due by October 25, 2019; Dispositive Motions due by November 1, 2019; Final Settlement Report due by February 18, 2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by February 21, 2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on February 26, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for March 3, 2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for March 9, 2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 4/5/2019. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on March 19, 2019 by John Siegal, Esq. (Mark, Monica)
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany A Miao on behalf of Henkel Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Tiffany A. Miao (Miao, Tiffany)
April 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by John Siegal on behalf of Henkel Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: John Siegal (Siegal, John)
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Davenport, Andrea)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER from Daniel T. Flaherty clarifying for the Court and counsel the status of certain website evidence referenced in the parties' submissions on plaintiff's pending motion for a TRO. (Flaherty, Daniel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mark, Monica)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Robert Stave in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Flaherty, Daniel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Michael D. Cecil in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Flaherty, Daniel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Henkel Corporation re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Local Rule 7(j) Index of Unpublished Authorities)(Flaherty, Daniel)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R Willenbrink on behalf of Henkel Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Zachary R. Willenbrink (Willenbrink, Zachary)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Regarding Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Henkel Corporation. (Flaherty, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 4/2/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Flaherty on behalf of Henkel Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel T. Flaherty (Flaherty, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Henkel Corporation. (Flaherty, Daniel)
March 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Henkel Corporation. (asc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Mark, Monica)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Hutson Polakowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jessica Hutson Polakowski (Polakowski, Jessica)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M Davenport on behalf of SC Johnson & Son Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrea M. Davenport (Davenport, Andrea)
March 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Monica)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tara Kowalski)(Mark, Monica)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SC Johnson & Son Inc. (Mark, Monica)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by SC Johnson & Son Inc (Mark, Monica)
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Henkel Corporation by SC Johnson & Son Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3053787) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Sample Advertising)(Mark, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SC Johnson & Son Inc v. Henkel Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SC Johnson & Son Inc
Represented By: Brittany A. Killian
Represented By: Monica A Mark
Represented By: James Emory Regan
Represented By: Jessica Hutson Polakowski
Represented By: Andrea M Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corp
Represented By: Tiffany Miao
Represented By: Edward J. Heath
Represented By: Charles F. Modzelewski
Represented By: John Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?