Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00809
Filed: May 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 AO 121 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Pipech, L.)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Approved. So ORDERED re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Malibu Media, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/16/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of John Doe, Subscriber IP Address: 76.118.86.69 without Prejudice by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re #10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief of Service of Subpoena (Conway, Kevin)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachments) (Murphy, Tatihana)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 05/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 05/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Discovery due by 11/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/26/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 26, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
May 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
May 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5294486.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?