Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America and Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00829
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Cutter Enterprises, LLC to 7/31/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America to 7/31/2019. See 9 Order. (Bozek, M.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time to and including 7/31/19. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/2/19. (Hall, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2019 respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America. (Martin, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Martin on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America for the limited purpose of filing an extension of time (Martin, Peter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Martin on behalf of Cutter Enterprises, LLC (Martin, Peter)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cutter Enterprises, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jared M. Alfin* *Hassett & George, P.C.* *945 Hopmeadow St.* *Simsbury, CT 06070*. (Bozek, M.)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint filed by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 31, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Alfin, Jared)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/30/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2019. Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Bozek, M.)
May 30, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5299124.), filed by Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc.(Alfin, Jared) Modified on 5/30/2019 to edit text (Walker, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc. v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of North America
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingspan Insulated Panels, Inc.
Represented By: Jared M. Alfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?