Buchholz v. American Cruise Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Victor Buchholz
Defendant: American Cruise Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00830
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by American Cruise Lines, Inc..(Carton, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for American Cruise Lines, Inc. to 7/26/2019. (Imbriani, Susan)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving re #12 Stipulation filed by American Cruise Lines, Inc. Counsel are requested to file motions for extension of time in compliance with the local rules of civil procedure. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/10/2019.(Welles, T.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by American Cruise Lines, Inc.. (Carton, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey I. Carton on behalf of American Cruise Lines, Inc. (Carton, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor Buchholz. American Cruise Lines, Inc. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Bohonnon, Kenneth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American Cruise Lines, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kenneth Wynne Bohonnon* *Bohonnon Law Firm* *195 Church St., 8th Fl.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Imbriani, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Victor Buchholz, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Docket Entry Correction re #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order. Incorrect Orders entered. (Imbriani, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 5/31/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/30/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 5/31/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2019; Discovery due by 11/29/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 5/31/2019 (Imbriani, Susan). Modified to correct signatory.
May 30, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Walker, J.)
May 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to American Cruise Lines, Inc.. (Bohonnon, Kenneth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Cruise Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5299386.), filed by Victor Buchholz.(Bohonnon, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchholz v. American Cruise Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Buchholz
Represented By: Kenneth Wynne Bohonnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cruise Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Carton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?