Pomales v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Pedro Pomales
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00831
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Pedro Pomales. (Reilly, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Van Nostrand, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Pedro Pomales.Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Tooker, A.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Motion for Pre-Filing Conference is denied as moot as it is not required for the filing of a Motion to Remand. The Motion to Remand (Exhibit A) will be docketed this date; opposition shall be filed by July 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/13/19. (Tooker, A.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pedro Pomales. (Reilly, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference re: Motion to Remand Conference by Pedro Pomales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Motion to Remand)(Reilly, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Reilly on behalf of Pedro Pomales (Reilly, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Van Nostrand, Richard)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia) Modified on 5/31/2019 (Reis, Julia).
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/30/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/30/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2019 Discovery due by 11/29/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020 Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 30, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Walker, J.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Statement Pursuant to Standing Order (Van Nostrand, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC of Pending Motions (Van Nostrand, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Civil Action Cover Sheet (Van Nostrand, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Van Nostrand on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Van Nostrand, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Superior Court of Windham at Putnam, case number WWM-CV-19-6017056-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5299391, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Van Nostrand, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomales v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Van Nostrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Pomales
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?