Lennon et al v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lennon and Malvi Lennon
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Elliott Company, Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., CBS Corp., General Electric Company, Eaton Corp. and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00848
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Janet Bond Arterton. Defense counsel shall initiate the call to chambers, 203-773-2737. (Barry, Donna)
July 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 11/30/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2030, Status Report due by 12/7/2020, Trial Brief due by 1/15/2021 if no dispositive motions are filed and Trial Ready Date 6/1/2021. (Barry, Donna)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 4:00 PM. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019 Discovery due by 11/30/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2020 Status Report due by 12/7/2020 Trial Ready Date 6/1/2021 If no dispositive motions are filed, the parties' Joint Trial Memorandum due by 1/15/2021.(Tooker, A.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Gamco Investors, Inc. for CBS Corp.. (Martin, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of CBS Corp. (Martin, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by CBS Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Joinder in Removal (Martin, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 Eaton Hydraulics LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Special Defenses with jury demand by Eaton Corp..(Vellucci, Margreta)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Margreta Vellucci on behalf of Eaton Corp. (Vellucci, Margreta)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corp.. (Vellucci, Margreta)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company. (D'Agostino, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Special Defenses by Elliott Company.(D'Agostino, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Elliott Company (D'Agostino, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wasil on behalf of Elliott Company (Wasil, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., CBS Corp., Eaton Corp., Elliott Company, Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Special Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against General Electric Company by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Crane Co. Statement of Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Lyons, Thomas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Crane Co., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019 Discovery due by 12/3/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Crane Co. re: Notice of Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV-19-6055560-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5303133, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Pantaleoni Pt. 1, #3 Exhibit 2: Pantaleoni Pt. 2, #4 Exhibit 2: Pantaleoni Pt. 3, #5 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 1, #6 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 2, #7 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 3, #8 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 4, #9 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 5, #10 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 6, #11 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 1, #12 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 2, #13 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 3, #14 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 4, #15 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 5, #16 Exhibit 5: State Notice of Removal, #17 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lennon et al v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corp.
Represented By: Margreta Vellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lennon
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malvi Lennon
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?