Duah Food Store, LLC et al v. USA
Plaintiff: Mati Ullah and Duah Food Store, LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00849
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Duah Food Store, LLC, Mati Ullah and Notice of Filing Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USPS Forms 3811)(Tapp, Andrew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff Duah Food Store, LLC by Duah Food Store, LLC, Mati Ullah. (Tapp, Andrew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tapp on behalf of Duah Food Store, LLC, Mati Ullah (Tapp, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Christopher DeMatteo* *DeMatteo Legal Solutions* *203 Campbell Ave.* *West Haven, CT 06516*. (Reis, Julia)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Duah Food Store, LLC, Mati Ullah, #2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Z. Tapp to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5303241) filed by Duah Food Store, LLC, Mati Ullah, 3 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019. (Lewis, D)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019 Discovery due by 12/3/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (DeMatteo, Christopher)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Z. Tapp to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5303241) by Duah Food Store, LLC, Mati Ullah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Z. Tapp, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Andrew Z. Tapp, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeMatteo, Christopher)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5303153.), filed by Duah Food Store, LLC, Mati Ullah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeMatteo, Christopher) Modified text on 6/3/2019 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duah Food Store, LLC et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mati Ullah
Represented By: Christopher DeMatteo
Represented By: Andrew Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duah Food Store, LLC
Represented By: Christopher DeMatteo
Represented By: Andrew Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?