Barton et al v. Lapenta et al
Plaintiff: Robert Flos, Dale Barton and Giovanni Vecchiato
Defendant: Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc., Robert V. Lapenta, William D Ingram, Charles J. Schafer, Stephen G. Virtue, Dennis McCarthy, James A Depalma and Charles J Schafer
Case Number: 3:2019cv00856
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/1/19. (Tooker, A.)
June 28, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 3:19-cv-00621-JBA. (Reis, Julia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Charles J Schafer waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019 filed by Dale Barton; Robert Flos; Giovanni Vecchiato. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stephen G. Virtue waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019 filed by Dale Barton; Robert Flos; Giovanni Vecchiato. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019 filed by Dale Barton; Robert Flos; Giovanni Vecchiato. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to William D Ingram waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019 filed by Dale Barton; Robert Flos; Giovanni Vecchiato. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert V. Lapenta waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019 filed by Dale Barton; Robert Flos; Giovanni Vecchiato. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dennis McCarthy waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019 filed by Dale Barton; Robert Flos; Giovanni Vecchiato. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to James A Depalma waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019 filed by Dale Barton; Robert Flos; Giovanni Vecchiato. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet Bond Arterton for all further proceedings. All further pleadings or documents in this matter should be filed with the Clerk's Office in New Haven and bear the docket number 3:19-cv-00856-JBA. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/14/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:19-cv-00721-JBA, 3:19-cv-00716-VAB, and 3:19-cv-00621-JBA by Dale Barton, Robert Flos, Giovanni Vecchiato.Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Steven M. Frederick, #3 Exhibit A - BFV Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Persin Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Wages Complaint, #6 Exhibit D - May 6, 2019 8-K, #7 Exhibit E - May 13, 2019 8-K, #8 Exhibit F - BES Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit G - Wofsey Firm Resume, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillipps, Zachary)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James A Depalma, William D Ingram, Robert V. Lapenta, Dennis McCarthy, Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc., Charles J Schafer, Stephen G. Virtue* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary John Phillipps* *Wofsey, Rosen, Kweskin & Kuriansky* *600 Summer St.* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Dale Barton, Giovanni Vecchiato, Robert Flos, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Dale Barton, Giovanni Vecchiato, Robert Flos, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/05/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2019. Discovery due by 12/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 3, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
June 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary John Phillipps on behalf of Dale Barton, Robert Flos, Giovanni Vecchiato (Phillipps, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5303920.), filed by Giovanni Vecchiato, Robert Flos, Dale Barton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verifciation of Dale Barton, #2 Exhibit Verification of Robert Flos, #3 Exhibit Verifciation of Giovanni Vecchiato)(Frederick, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton et al v. Lapenta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Flos
Represented By: Zachary John Phillipps
Represented By: Steven M. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Barton
Represented By: Zachary John Phillipps
Represented By: Steven M. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Vecchiato
Represented By: Zachary John Phillipps
Represented By: Steven M. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revolution Lighting Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert V. Lapenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen G. Virtue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Depalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?