Simon et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aryeh Simon and Sassya Simon
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., Does 1-5, Arne Sorenson and Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00873
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.)
June 27, 2019 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in District of Maryland as case 8:19-cv-01792, filed 06/27/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 27, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the District of Maryland. (Oliver, T.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MDL Transfer ORDER. Case transferred to District of Maryland Signed by Clerk, John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 6/17/2019.(Perez, J.)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay; finding as moot #13 Motion to Remand to State Court; finding as moot #14 Motion for Extension of Time. "'[T]he power to stay proceedings is incidental to the power inherent in every court to control the disposition of the causes on its docket with economy of time and effort for itself, for counsel, and for litigants.'" Louis Vuitton Malletier S.A. v. LY USA, Inc., 676 F.3d 83, 96 (2d Cir. 2012) (quoting Landis v. N. Am. Co., 299 U.S. 248, 254 (1936)); accord Clinton v. Jones, 520 U.S. 681, 706 (1997) ("The District Court has broad discretion to stay proceedings as an incident to its power to control its own docket." (citing Landis, 299 U.S. at 254)). The Court therefore grants the motion to stay this action pending a transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.Accordingly, this action is stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on whether to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland for consolidated pretrial proceedings in In re Marriot International, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2879. The Court also finds all other pending motions moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/11/2019. (Washington, Gregory)
June 11, 2019 Docket Entry Correction: Document #17 Order, entered on this case in error. (Reis, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION re #14 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve a Responsive Pleading filed by Sassya Simon, Aryeh Simon. (Jones, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Sassya Simon, Aryeh Simon. (Jones, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENTERED IN ERROR - Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Reis, Julia).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve a Responsive Pleading by Marriott International, Inc., Arne Sorenson, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - In re Marriott CMO 3, #2 Exhibit B - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-8), #3 Exhibit C - JPML Certified Transfer Order (Mann), #4 Exhibit D - Emails re Marriott v. Simon)(Song, Brian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sassya Simon, Aryeh Simon.Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Jones, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT I - Civil Cover Sheet by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Arne Sorenson re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Song, Brian) Modified on 6/11/2019 to include additional filer (Reis, Julia)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 6/6/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., #2 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., #9 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., #3 Notice of Related Case filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Marriott International, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2019. Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 5, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Arne Sorenson. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Transfer Order.pdf, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Tag-Along Action_.pdf, #4 Exhibit C - In re Marriott CMO No. 1.pdf, #5 Exhibit D - In re Marriott CMO No. 2.pdf, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Song, Brian) Modified on 6/11/2019 to include additional filer (Reis, Julia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mars Merger Sub, LLC, Other Affiliate Marriott International, Inc. for Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC. (Song, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc.. (Song, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Arne Sorenson (Song, Brian) Modified on 6/11/2019 to include additional filer (Reis, Julia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Arne Sorenson of No Pending Motions (Song, Brian) Modified on 6/11/2019 to include additional filer (Reis, Julia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc. from Superior Court of the Judicial District of Stamford, case number FST-CV-19-6041703-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5307444, filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Arne Sorenson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Simon Complaint.pdf, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket.pdf, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Summons.pdf, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service.pdf, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal.pdf, #6 Exhibit F - Frank Complaint.pdf, #7 Exhibit G - Frank Notice of Removal.pdf, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.pdf)(Song, Brian) Modified on 6/11/2019 to include additional filer (Reis, Julia).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Brian W. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arne Sorenson
Represented By: Brian W. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Brian W. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aryeh Simon
Represented By: Theodore J. Folkman
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sassya Simon
Represented By: Theodore J. Folkman
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?