Berke v. First Student, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andrew Berke
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00887
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2019; Discovery due by 3/31/2020; Initial Status Report due by 8/23/2019; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2020; Settlement Conference 4/2020; Trial Ready Date 9/1/2020; Trial Brief due by 6/30/2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/23/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Michaud, Megan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by First Student, Inc..(Mastrony, Maura)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/20/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for First Student, Inc. to 7/14/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 7/14/2019 to file a responsive pleading or motion directed to Plaintiff's Compliant. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/11/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Andrew Berke (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Andrew Berke. (Michaud, Megan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Leigh Michaud on behalf of Andrew Berke (Michaud, Megan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 14, 2019 to file a responsive pleading or motion directed to Plaintiff's Compliant by First Student, Inc.. (Mastrony, Maura)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Standing Protective Order, #10 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #5 Notice (Other) filed by First Student, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal filed by First Student, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by First Student, Inc., #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by First Student, Inc., #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by First Student, Inc., #8 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by First Student, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/07/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/07/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2019. Discovery due by 12/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 7, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Student, Inc.. (Mastrony, Maura)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by First Student, Inc. Statement Regarding Removed Cases (Mastrony, Maura)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by First Student, Inc. of Pending Motions (Mastrony, Maura)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Thomas Dickinson on behalf of First Student, Inc. (Dickinson, Craig)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Mastrony on behalf of First Student, Inc. (Mastrony, Maura)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Student, Inc. from Superior Court, case number HHB-CV19-6052949-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5310257, filed by First Student, Inc..(Mastrony, Maura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berke v. First Student, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Thomas Dickinson
Represented By: Maura Mastrony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Berke
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?