Liu v. Tangney et al
Plaintiff: Quinghe Liu and King Liu
Defendant: John Tangney and Ailing Zhou
Case Number: 3:2019cv00894
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Answer deadline updated for John Tangney and Ailing Zhou to 9/15/2019. (Barry, Donna)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendant's #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, absent objection and for good cause shown. Accordingly, Defendant must file a responsive pleading to the #1 Complaint on or before September 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 08/02/2019. (Chen, C.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2019 To Plead #1 Complaint by John Tangney. (Williams, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Williams on behalf of John Tangney (Williams, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quinghe Liu. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Marshal Return)(Williams, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *John Tangney, Ailing Zhou* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Reis, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Quinghe Liu, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Quinghe Liu, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019 Discovery due by 12/10/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)
June 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Williams, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Quinghe Liu (Williams, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5311998.), filed by Quinghe Liu.(Williams, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Tangney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinghe Liu
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Liu
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tangney
Represented By: James G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ailing Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?