Hinson v. MacLean Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Travis Hinson
Defendant: MacLean Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00896
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management PlanAmended Pleadings due by 9/4/2019. Discovery due by 5/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2020. Status Report due by 11/6/2019. Trial Brief due by 6/16/2020. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blinn, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by MacLean Associates, LLC.(Katz, Johanna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MacLean Associates, LLC, filed by Travis Hinson.(Blinn, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/5/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna S. Katz on behalf of MacLean Associates, LLC (Katz, Johanna)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Hawks-Ladds on behalf of MacLean Associates, LLC (Hawks-Ladds, Joshua)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Hinson. MacLean Associates, LLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Blinn, Daniel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *MacLean Associates, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Reis, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Travis Hinson, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019 Discovery due by 12/10/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 10, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
June 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to MacLean Associates, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel) Modified on 6/10/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MacLean Associates, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5312210.), filed by Travis Hinson.(Blinn, Daniel) Modified on 6/10/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinson v. MacLean Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Hinson
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacLean Associates, LLC
Represented By: Johanna S. Katz
Represented By: Joshua A. Hawks-Ladds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?