Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Norko et al
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Dorine Norko and Lawrence Manlapit, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00914
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Lawrence Manlapit, Jr served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Sisley, Amanda)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dorine Norko* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Lynn Sisley* *Block, Janney & Sisley, LLC* *138 Main Street* *Norwich, CT 06360*. (Oliver, T.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lawrence Manlapit, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Lynn Sisley* *Block, Janney & Sisley, LLC* *138 Main Street* *Norwich, CT 06360*. (Oliver, T.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2019.(Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/13/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/13/2019.(Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019 Discovery due by 12/13/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2019.(Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Dorine Norko. (Sisley, Amanda)
June 13, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Lawrence Manlapit, Jr. (Sisley, Amanda)
June 13, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial Inc for Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Sisley, Amanda) Modified on 6/13/2019 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5317658.), filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through E)(Sisley, Amanda) Modified on 6/13/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Norko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorine Norko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Manlapit, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Amanda Lynn Sisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?