Palmer v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kyle Richard Palmer
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00920
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kyle Richard Palmer, Andrew M. Saul. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/9/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
July 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kyle Richard Palmer of consent to magistrate judge authority (Huebner, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without prepayment of fees, costs or security therefor, which includes an affidavit regarding his current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . In plaintiff's motion, he states that he has been unemployed since 2015. See id. at 2. His income is limited to government assistance, including $196 in cash benefits per month. See id. at 3. Plaintiff has no assets, and receives SNAP benefits. See id. at 3-5. Plaintiff has outstanding debt, and provides some support to his mother. See id. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED.Additionally, Andrew M. Saul was confirmed as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on June 4, 2019. He is now the proper defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P 25(d); 42 U.S.C. 405(g). The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket accordingly. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 6/20/19. (Dowie, C)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Jewett on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Jewett, Peter)
June 13, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Nancy Berryhill to 8/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/13/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/13/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent form) (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with supporting financial affidavit by Kyle Richard Palmer. (Huebner, Gary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kyle Richard Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Appeals Council Action)(Huebner, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Peter Jewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Richard Palmer
Represented By: Gary W. Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?