Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd. v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Sigurdur Olafsson, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Michael Mcclellan, Deborah Griffin, Yaacov Altman, Yitzhak Peterburg, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman, Kare Schultz and Allan Oberman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00923
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Allan Oberman waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Dipankar Bhattacharjee waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Sigurdur Olafsson waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Yaacov Altman waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Michael Mcclellan waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Maureen Cavanaugh waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Deborah Griffin waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Erez Vigodman waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Kare Schultz waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Yitzhak Peterburg waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019; Eyal Desheh waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/28/2019 filed by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.. (Ferron, Margaret)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Stay Action by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman.Responses due by 8/23/2019 (O'Toole, Jill)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5363214) by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman. (Hershman, Jordan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Hershman on behalf of Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman (Hershman, Jordan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Attorney Jordan D. Hershman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/18/2019. (Oliver, T.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (O'Toole, Jill)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5363214) by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman. (O'Toole, Jill)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/17/2019.(Jaiman, R.)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/16/2019.(Lewis, D)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman (O'Toole, Jill)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Wernke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334526) by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.. (Wernke, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wernke on behalf of Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd. (Wernke, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334502) by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Lieberman on behalf of Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Attorney Michael J. Wernke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Reis, Julia)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Wernke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334526) by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael J. Wernke)(Ferron, Margaret)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5334502) by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jeremy A. Lieberman)(Ferron, Margaret)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret B. Ferron on behalf of Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd. (Ferron, Margaret)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erin Green Comite* *Scott & Scott LLP - CT* *156 South Main Street, P. O. Box 192* *Colchester, CT 06415*. (Reis, Julia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd., #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019 Discovery due by 12/13/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 13, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.. (Comite, Erin)
June 13, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Comite, Erin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5319115.), filed by Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Comite, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd. v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dipankar Bhattacharjee
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mcclellan
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Griffin
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaacov Altman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yitzhak Peterburg
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kare Schultz
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Oberman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdal Mutual Funds, Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?