Price v. Duncaster Lifecare Community
Plaintiff: LaShawn Price
Defendant: Duncaster, Inc. and Duncaster Lifecare Community
Consolidated Plaintiff: Eugene Axelrod
Case Number: 3:2019cv00932
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Duncaster Lifecare Community waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed by LaShawn Price. (Axelrod, Eugene)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Duncaster Lifecare Community, filed by LaShawn Price.(Axelrod, Eugene)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/26/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Duncaster Lifecare Community* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eugene N. Axelrod* *Axelrod & Associates, LLC.* *8 Lunar Dr.* *Woodbridge, CT 06525*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by LaShawn Price, #5 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 06/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 17, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to LaShawn Price. (Axelrod, Eugene)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019. Discovery due by 12/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 14, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Duncaster Lifecare Community ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5321409.), filed by LaShawn Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Axelrod, Eugene) Modified on 6/17/2019 to update parties (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Duncaster Lifecare Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncaster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncaster Lifecare Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShawn Price
Represented By: Eugene N. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eugene Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?