Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Luis A. Rivera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00944
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Monika Crawford on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Crawford, Monika)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without prepayment of fees, costs or security therefor, which includes an affidavit regarding his current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . In plaintiff's motion, he states that he has been unemployed since 2015, and that he has three dependent children, two of whom are minors. See id. at 2-3. Plaintiff's family relies on plaintiff's spouse's modest monthly income and $293 in monthly SNAP benefits. See id. at 3. This income just covers the family's listed monthly expenses, which does not include certain expected expenses, like food. See id. at 4-5. Plaintiff has no cash on hand, and has minimal assets as compared to his debts. See id. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered.The Court notes: "In lieu of service of process of the Complaint and related documents, the Clerk of the Court shall provide service via the Courts CM/ECF system to the Commissioner of Social Security by electronically serving it on the Social Security Administrations Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorneys Office for the District of Connecticut. If this process is followed, the Defendant has agreed that it will constitute adequate service of process." Doc. #4 at 2. Staff notes in this case, not accessible on the public docket, reflect that such service was effectuated on June 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 6/20/19. (Dowie, C)
June 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
June 18, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Luis A. Rivera to 8/19/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
June 18, 2019 Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Hushin, Z.)
June 18, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Hushin, Z.) Modified on 6/19/2019 to correct date (Hushin, Z.).
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luis A. Rivera. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Luis A. Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Rivera
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Monika Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?